Cooley v. PHH Mortgage Services
Plaintiff: Emma Lee Cooley
Defendant: PHH Mortgage Services
Case Number: 5:2019cv00225
Filed: June 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Terrence W Boyle
Referring Judge: Louise Wood Flanagan
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 19, 2019 Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT against PHH Mortgage Services filed by Emma Lee Cooley. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Letter to Raeford and Emma Cooley dated 3/12/2019, #2 Exhibit B - Letter to Raeford and Emma Cooley dated 4/24/2019 from PHH Mortgage, #3 Exhibit C - Notice of Mortgage Payment Change, #4 Exhibit D - Copies of cancelled checks and letters from PHH Mortgage, #5 Exhibit E - Notice of Right to Cure Default, #6 Letter from PHH Mortgage Services) (Stouch, L.)
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #6 Motion to Amend Complaint. Signed by Chief Judge Terrence W. Boyle on 7/19/2019. Copy sent via US Mail to Emma Lee Cooley 1429 Castleberry Rd., Clayton, NC 27527. (Stouch, L.)
July 10, 2019 Motion Submitted to Chief Judge Terrence W. Boyle regarding #6 MOTION to Amend #1 Complaint. (Stouch, L.)
June 21, 2019 Filing 7 Proposed Amended Complaint filed by Emma Lee Cooley. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (Stouch, L.)
June 17, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Amend #1 Complaint,, filed by Emma Lee Cooley. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit E - Notice of Right to Cure Default, #2 Exhibit F - Letter from PHH Mortgage Services, #3 Envelope) (Stouch, L.)
June 10, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to PHH Mortgage Services. Copy sent to Emma Lee Cooley at 1429 Castleberry Rd., Clayton, NC 27527 for service on defendant. (Stouch, L.)
June 6, 2019 Filing 4 REASSIGNMENT ORDER. At the direction of the Court, and for the continued efficient administration of justice, the above-captioned case is reassigned to the Honorable Terrence W. Boyle, Chief United States District Judge, for all further proceedings. United States District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan is no longer assigned to the case. All future documents shall reflect the revised case number of 5:19-CV-225-BO. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 6/6/2019. (Collins, S.)
June 4, 2019 Filing 3 Financial Disclosure Statement filed by Emma Lee Cooley. (Rudd, D.)
June 4, 2019 Filing 2 Notice of Self-Representation filed by Emma Lee Cooley. (Rudd, D.)
June 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against PHH Mortgage Services (Filing fee $400.00 receipt number RAL072106), filed by Emma Lee Cooley. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Letter to Raeford and Emma Cooley dated 3/12/2019, #2 Exhibit B- Letter to Raeford and Emma Cooley dated 4/24/2019 from PHH Mortgage, #3 Exhibit C- Notice of Mortgage Payment Change, #4 Exhibit D- Copies of cancelled checks and letters from PHH Mortgage, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Notice of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of Summons, #7 Proposed Summons) (Rudd, D.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cooley v. PHH Mortgage Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PHH Mortgage Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emma Lee Cooley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?