United States of America v. Bailey et al
Interested Party: John F. Logan and Clerk of Court Stephanie Butler
Appellee: Candice Marie Bailey and John Douglas Bailey
Appellant: United States of America
Case Number: 5:2019cv00226
Filed: June 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: James C Dever
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 Motion for Extension of Time to File. The United States shall file its opening brief no later than August 23, 2019; and the debtors shall file their opening brief no later than September 23, 2019; with the United States to file its reply brief no later than October 11, 2019. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 7/3/2019. (Sellers, N.)
July 3, 2019 Motion Referred to Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court regarding #13 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Appellant and Appellee Briefs. (Sellers, N.)
July 3, 2019 Filing 13 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Appellant and Appellee Briefs filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Bishop, Kyle)
June 25, 2019 Filing 12 Notice to Parties Regarding Filing of Bankruptcy Record on Appeal. Briefs must be filed in accordance with Rule 8018 of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure. (Sellers, N.)
June 25, 2019 Filing 11 Certificate of Readiness and Completion of Record filed by the Bankruptcy Court. (Donleycott, S.)
June 25, 2019 Filing 10 Transmission of Bankruptcy Appeal Record re #1 Bankruptcy Appeal. (Donleycott, S.)
June 25, 2019 Filing 9 Transmitting copy of docket sheet. The Bankruptcy Court certifies that this is a true and accurate copy of the docket on file. (Donleycott, S.)
June 25, 2019 Filing 8 SEALED BANKRUPTCY TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on December 18, 2018, before Judge David M. Warren. Court Reporter/Transcriber Acorn Transcripts, LLC. This document must be accessed through the originating Bankruptcy Court. (Donleycott, S.)
June 25, 2019 Filing 7 Appellant's Bankruptcy Record on Appeal filed. (Attachments: #1 Documents 1, 5, 8-9 and 11-14 from Designation, #2 Claim 4-1, #3 Claim 4-2, #4 Claim 4-3, #5 Claim 4-4, #6 Claim 4-5) (Donleycott, S.)
June 5, 2019 Filing 6 Financial Disclosure Statement by Candice Marie Bailey (Sasser, Travis)
June 5, 2019 Filing 5 Financial Disclosure Statement by John Douglas Bailey (Sasser, Travis)
June 5, 2019 Filing 4 Notice of Appearance filed by Travis Philip Sasser on behalf of Candice Marie Bailey, John Douglas Bailey. (Sasser, Travis)
June 4, 2019 Filing 3 Notice of Appearance filed by Kyle L. Bishop on behalf of United States of America. (Bishop, Kyle)
June 4, 2019 Notice to Counsel - All Counsel should file a Notice of Appearance pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.2(a). (Rudd, D.)
June 4, 2019 Filing 2 Notice of Docketing and Briefing Deadline regarding #1 Bankruptcy Appeal. (Rudd, D.)
June 4, 2019 Filing 1 Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. Bankruptcy Court case number 18-03328-5-DMW. (Attachments: #1 Judge David M. Warren's Order dated May 24, 2019) (Donleycott, S.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Bailey et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: John F. Logan
Represented By: Michael Brandon Burnett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Clerk of Court Stephanie Butler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Candice Marie Bailey
Represented By: Travis Philip Sasser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: John Douglas Bailey
Represented By: Travis Philip Sasser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: United States of America
Represented By: Kyle L. Bishop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?