Spain v. Jonas Fitness, Inc.
Plaintiff: Malinda Spain
Defendant: Jonas Fitness, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2019cv00233
Filed: June 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Louise Wood Flanagan
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 5, 2019 TEXT ORDER granting Defendant's unopposed Motion for Extension of Time #9 . For good cause shown, it is ordered that Defendant has up to and including August 26, 2019, within which to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint #1 . Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 8/5/2019. (Hockaday, A.)
August 2, 2019 Motion Referred to Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court regarding #9 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer regarding #1 Complaint. (Collins, S.)
August 2, 2019 Filing 9 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer regarding #1 Complaint, filed by Jonas Fitness, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Passeri, Sarah)
August 2, 2019 Filing 8 Notice of Appearance filed by Sarah G. Passeri on behalf of Jonas Fitness, Inc.. (Passeri, Sarah)
July 26, 2019 Filing 7 Notice directing plaintiff to proceed after failure to answer in accordance with Rule 55 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure within twenty-one (21) days of receipt of this notice. (Collins, S.)
July 10, 2019 Filing 6 Affidavit of Service for Summons and Complaint filed by Malinda Spain served on Jonas Fitness on July 3, 2019. (Wilkerson, David)
June 20, 2019 Filing 5 Notice of Special Appearance for non-district by Garrett O. Berg on behalf of Malinda Spain. (Berg, Garrett)
June 10, 2019 Filing 4 Financial Disclosure Statement by Malinda Spain (Wilkerson, David)
June 10, 2019 Filing 3 Notice of Appearance filed by David Matthew Wilkerson on behalf of Malinda Spain. (Wilkerson, David)
June 10, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Jonas Fitness, Inc. (*NOTICE: Counsel shall print the attached summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4.*). (Rudd, D.)
June 10, 2019 Notice to Counsel - Counsel is reminded that the court prefers flattened pdf fillable forms. Counsel should "flatten" the proposed summons and the civil cover sheet prior to attaching it in accordance with Section IV.B of the CM/ECF Policies and Procedures Manual. No further action needed at this time. (Rudd, D.)
June 10, 2019 Notice to Counsel - Counsel should file a Notice of Appearance pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.2(a). (Rudd, D.)
June 10, 2019 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY - Failure to File Financial Disclosure Statement as to Malinda Spain. Pursuant to 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Civil Rule 7.3, all parties shall file a financial disclosure statement. A negative statement is required if a party has no disclosures to make. The disclosure statement must be on a form provided by the clerk. This form is available at the clerk's office and on the court's website. (Rudd, D.)
June 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Class Action Complaint against Jonas Fitness, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0417-4975310.), filed by Malinda Spain. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Wilkerson, David) (Attachment 1 and 2 flattened and replaced on 6/10/2019) (Edwards, S.).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Spain v. Jonas Fitness, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonas Fitness, Inc.
Represented By: Sarah G. Passeri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Malinda Spain
Represented By: David Matthew Wilkerson
Represented By: Garrett O. Berg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?