Waddell v. Charter Communications
Plaintiff: Monique Waddell
Defendant: Charter Communications
Case Number: 5:2019cv00237
Filed: June 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Terrence W Boyle
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 12, 2019 Filing 10 JUDGMENT - IT IS ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED plaintiff's complaint is hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by deputy clerk for Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 7/12/2019. Copy sent via US Mail to Monique Waddell 2613 Quarry Ridge Lane, Raleigh, NC 27610. (Stouch, L.)
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Order Dismissing Case Without Prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge Terrence W. Boyle on 7/12/2019. Copy sent via US Mail to Monique Waddell 2613 Quarry Ridge Lane, Raleigh, NC 27610. (Stouch, L.)
July 2, 2019 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT in Support of Plaintiff's Claims For Relief by Monique Waddell (Stouch, L.)
June 17, 2019 Filing 5 COMPLAINT against Charter Communications, filed by Monique Waddell. (Stouch, L.)
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert B. Jones, Jr on 6/17/2019. Copy sent via US Mail to Monique Waddell, Raleigh, NC 27610. (Stouch, L.)
June 11, 2019 Motion Referred to US Magistrate Judge Robert B. Jones, Jr regarding #1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (Stouch, L.)
June 10, 2019 Filing 3 Financial Disclosure Statement filed by Monique Waddell. (Rudd, D.)
June 10, 2019 Filing 2 Notice of Self-Representation filed by Monique Waddell. (Rudd, D.)
June 10, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, filed by Monique Waddell. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Rudd, D.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Waddell v. Charter Communications
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Monique Waddell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charter Communications
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?