Securities and Exchange Commission v. Perkins et al
Plaintiff: Securities and Exchange Commission
Defendant: Perkins HSU Export Corporation, Mabiala Phuati, Yilaime Corporation of Nevada, Alton Perkins, AmericaTowne Holdings, Inc., Alton and Xiang Mei Lin Perkins Family Trust and Yilaime Corporation of NC
Case Number: 5:2019cv00243
Filed: June 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: W Earl Britt
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 15:77
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 7, 2019 Filing 13 Answer to Complaint and Motion to Dismiss filed by Mabiala Phuati. (Attachments: #1 Petition for Name Change, #2 Certificate of Naturalization, #3 Envelope) (Herrmann, L.)
June 18, 2019 Filing 12 Waiver of Service Returned Executed filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. Alton and Xiang Mei Lin Perkins Family Trust waiver sent on 6/14/2019, answer due 8/13/2019. (Kim, Paul)
June 18, 2019 Filing 11 Waiver of Service Returned Executed filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. Yilaime Corporation of Nevada waiver sent on 6/14/2019, answer due 8/13/2019. (Kim, Paul)
June 18, 2019 Filing 10 Waiver of Service Returned Executed filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. Yilaime Corporation of NC waiver sent on 6/14/2019, answer due 8/13/2019. (Kim, Paul)
June 18, 2019 Filing 9 Waiver of Service Returned Executed filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. Perkins HSU Export Corporation waiver sent on 6/14/2019, answer due 8/13/2019. (Kim, Paul)
June 18, 2019 Filing 8 Waiver of Service Returned Executed filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. AmericaTowne Holdings, Inc. waiver sent on 6/14/2019, answer due 8/13/2019. (Kim, Paul)
June 18, 2019 Filing 7 Waiver of Service Returned Executed filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. Alton Perkins waiver sent on 6/14/2019, answer due 8/13/2019. (Kim, Paul)
June 17, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Securities and Exchange Commission. Mabiala Phuati served on 6/15/2019, answer due 7/6/2019. (Kim, Paul)
June 14, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Mabiala Phuati. (*NOTICE: Counsel shall print the attached summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4.*) (Stouch, L.)
June 14, 2019 Notice to Counsel regarding: #4 Notice - Proposed Summons. Counsel is reminded that the court prefers flattened pdf fillable forms. Counsel should "flatten" the document prior to attaching it in accordance with Section IV.B of the CM/ECF Policies and Procedures Manual. (Stouch, L.)
June 14, 2019 Filing 4 Notice filed by Securities and Exchange Commission Proposed Summons to Mabiala Phuati. (Kim, Paul)
June 14, 2019 Notice to Counsel - No Summons provided for issuance or Waiver of Service filed. (Rudd, D.)
June 13, 2019 Filing 3 Notice of Appearance filed by Paul T. Kim on behalf of Securities and Exchange Commission. (Kim, Paul)
June 13, 2019 Filing 2 Notice of Appearance filed by Madison G Loomis on behalf of Securities and Exchange Commission. (Loomis, Madison)
June 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Injunctive and Other Relief against All Defendants, filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Loomis, Madison)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Securities and Exchange Commission v. Perkins et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Perkins HSU Export Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mabiala Phuati
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yilaime Corporation of Nevada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alton Perkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AmericaTowne Holdings, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alton and Xiang Mei Lin Perkins Family Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yilaime Corporation of NC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Securities and Exchange Commission
Represented By: Madison G Loomis
Represented By: Paul T. Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?