Oppenheimer v. Janovich et al
Plaintiff: David Oppenheimer
Defendant: Intellimark Technologies, Inc., Hopscotch Presents LLC, Mason M Merrill, Travis J Janovich and Etix Promotions, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2019cv00246
Filed: June 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Terrence W Boyle
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 28:1338
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Motion to Dismiss Merrill Mason, incorrectly named as Mason M Merrill. Signed by Chief Judge Terrence W. Boyle on 8/9/2019. (Stouch, L.)
August 8, 2019 Motion Submitted to Chief Judge Terrence W. Boyle regarding #11 MOTION to Dismiss Merrill M. Mason. (Stouch, L.)
August 5, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss Merrill M. Mason filed by David Oppenheimer. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Merrill M. Mason, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order) (LeJune, Dana)
July 12, 2019 Filing 10 Waiver of Service Returned Executed filed by David Oppenheimer. Etix Promotions, Inc. waiver sent on 6/20/2019, answer due 8/19/2019; Hopscotch Presents LLC waiver sent on 6/20/2019, answer due 8/19/2019; Intellimark Technologies, Inc. waiver sent on 6/20/2019, answer due 8/19/2019; Travis J Janovich waiver sent on 6/20/2019, answer due 8/19/2019. (LeJune, Dana)
June 20, 2019 Filing 9 Summons Reissued as to Travis J Janovich. (*NOTICE: Counsel shall print the attached summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4.*) (Stouch, L.)
June 19, 2019 Filing 8 AMENDED DOCUMENT by David Oppenheimer. Amendment to #1 Complaint, Amended Summons Request to Correct Spelling (LeJune, Dana)
June 18, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (*NOTICE: Counsel shall print the attached summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4.*) (Stouch, L.)
June 17, 2019 Filing 6 Notice of Appearance filed by Dana A. LeJune on behalf of David Oppenheimer. (LeJune, Dana)
June 17, 2019 Filing 5 Notice filed by David Oppenheimer regarding #1 Complaint, Proposed Summons to Travis J. Janovich, Mason M. Merrill, Hopscotch Presents, LLC, Intelli-Mark Technologies, Inc. and Etix Promotions, Inc.. (LeJune, Dana)
June 17, 2019 Filing 4 Notice filed by David Oppenheimer regarding #1 Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet. (LeJune, Dana)
June 17, 2019 Filing 3 Financial Disclosure Statement by David Oppenheimer (LeJune, Dana)
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order Redesignating Division to Western Division - The Honorable Terrence W. Boyle, Chief United States District Judge, will remain the presiding judge. All future documents shall reflect the new case number of 5:19-CV-246-BO. No further filing shall be made in 2:19-CV-20-BO. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 6/17/2019. (Stouch, L.)
June 17, 2019 Case Selected for Mediation - A printable list of certified mediators for the Eastern District of North Carolina is available on the court's Website, http://www.nced.uscourts.gov/attorney/mediators.aspx. Please serve this list on all parties. (Horton, B.)
June 14, 2019 Notice to Counsel - This case should have been filed in the Western division. The Clerk will enter a reassignment order correcting the error. (Rudd, D.)
June 14, 2019 Notice to Counsel - No Summons provided for issuance or Waiver of Service filed. (Rudd, D.)
June 14, 2019 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY regarding #1 Complaint. Counsel failed to file a JS44 Civil Cover Sheet as required by the Court. Counsel should file a Civil Cover Sheet using the event "Notice-Other" as soon as possible. (Rudd, D.)
June 14, 2019 Notice to Counsel - Counsel should file a Notice of Appearance pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.2(a). (Rudd, D.)
June 14, 2019 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY - Failure to File Financial Disclosure Statement as to David Oppenheimer. Pursuant to 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Civil Rule 7.3, all parties shall file a financial disclosure statement. A negative statement is required if a party has no disclosures to make. The disclosure statement must be on a form provided by the clerk. This form is available at the clerk's office and on the court's website. (Rudd, D.)
June 14, 2019 Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number RAL072325 (Rodriguez, M.)
June 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400.), filed by David Oppenheimer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit X1 - The Work, #2 Exhibit X2 - CR, #3 Exhibit X3 - Infringement, #4 Exhibit X4 C&D Letter, #5 Exhibit X5 Metadata in Infringed Copy) (LeJune, Dana)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Oppenheimer v. Janovich et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Intellimark Technologies, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hopscotch Presents LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mason M Merrill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travis J Janovich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Etix Promotions, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Oppenheimer
Represented By: Dana A. LeJune
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?