Bradley v. Analytical Grammar, Inc.

Plaintiff: Matthew Bradley
Defendant: Analytical Grammar, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2019cv00249
Filed: June 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Louise Wood Flanagan
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 1, 2019 SECOND Notice to Counsel regarding: #6 Notice of Appearance. Local Civil Rule 83.1(e) requires attorneys to file the Notice of Special Appearance that is available on the court's website. Counsel should file a Notice of Special Appearance that complies with this rule. In addition, pursuant to Section VI.C.2 of the CM/ECF Policies and Procedures Manual, each attorney making an appearance in the case must be a registered CM/ECF filer with this court and must file his or her own Notice of Appearance. (Collins, S.)
July 29, 2019 Notice to Counsel regarding: #6 Notice of Appearance. Local Civil Rule 83.1(e) requires attorneys to file the Notice of Special Appearance that is available on the court's website. Counsel should file a Notice of Special Appearance that complies with this rule. In addition, pursuant to Section VI.C.2 of the CM/ECF Policies and Procedures Manual, each attorney making an appearance in the case must be a registered CM/ECF filer with this court and must file his or her own Notice of Appearance. (Collins, S.)
July 26, 2019 Filing 6 Notice of Appearance filed by Seth L. Hudson on behalf of Matthew Bradley. (Hudson, Seth)
June 21, 2019 Filing 5 Notice of Appearance filed by Seth L. Hudson on behalf of Matthew Bradley. (Hudson, Seth)
June 19, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Analytical Grammar, Inc. (*NOTICE: Counsel shall print the attached summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4.*). (Rudd, D.)
June 19, 2019 Filing 3 COPYRIGHT REPORT: Copy of report and complaint forwarded to the Register of Copyrights located at the Copyright Office, Library of Congress, Washington, DC 20559 via US Mail on June 19, 2019. (Rudd, D.)
June 19, 2019 Notice to Counsel - All Counsel should file a Notice of Appearance pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.2(a). (Rudd, D.)
June 19, 2019 Case Selected for Mediation - A printable list of certified mediators for the Eastern District of North Carolina is available on the court's Website, http://www.nced.uscourts.gov/attorney/mediators.aspx. Please serve this list on all parties. (Horton, B.)
June 18, 2019 Filing 2 Financial Disclosure Statement by Matthew Bradley (Hudson, Seth)
June 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Analytical Grammar, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0417-4987547.), filed by Matthew Bradley. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Bradley Photograph, #2 Exhibit B - Screenshot of Analytical Grammar Website, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (Hudson, Seth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bradley v. Analytical Grammar, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Bradley
Represented By: Seth L. Hudson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Analytical Grammar, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?