Epic Games, Inc. v. C.B.

Plaintiff: Epic Games, Inc.
Defendant: C. B.
Case Number: 5:2019cv00250
Filed: June 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Louise Wood Flanagan
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:501
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER - Where defendant has filed a motion to dismiss, good cause appears to delay the parties' scheduling conference activities, and deadline for provision of their joint report and plan, where ordinarily at this juncture the court would trigger these activities in preface to its entry of a case management order through issuance of initial order regarding planning and scheduling. Unless a party raises objection to a stay of these activities, pending completion of briefing on the motion now at issue, and decision thereon by this court, in filing due within 14 days from date of entry of this order, the court will stay that aspect of the case so as to promote focus on the issues raised in defendant's motion. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 8/7/2019. (Collins, S.)
August 6, 2019 Notice to Counsel regarding: #18 Declaration, #16 Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction, #20 Motion to Seal Document, #17 Memorandum in Support. In future filings, counsel should indicate the division in accordance with Local Civil Rule 10.1(b) and 40.1(b) and (c). (Collins, S.)
August 5, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION to Seal Document #19 PROPOSED SEALED Declaration, filed by C. B.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Sasser, Jonathan)
August 5, 2019 Filing 19 PROPOSED SEALED Declaration (Selected Participants Only)by C.B. (available to: Defendant C. B., Plaintiff Epic Games, Inc.) regarding #17 Memorandum in Support, #16 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction . (Sasser, Jonathan)
August 5, 2019 Filing 18 Declaration regarding #17 Memorandum in Support, #16 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by C. B. filed by C. B.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1. Where are the Fortnite servers located) (Sasser, Jonathan)
August 5, 2019 Filing 17 Memorandum in Support regarding #16 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by C. B.. (Sasser, Jonathan)
August 5, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by C. B.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Sasser, Jonathan)
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #14 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer regarding #1 Complaint. C. B. answer due 8/5/2019. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 7/15/2019. (Collins, S.)
July 15, 2019 Motion Referred to Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court regarding #14 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer regarding #1 Complaint. (Collins, S.)
July 12, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer regarding #1 Complaint,,,, filed by C. B.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Sasser, Jonathan)
July 12, 2019 Filing 13 Financial Disclosure Statement by C. B. (Sasser, Jonathan)
July 12, 2019 Filing 12 Notice of Appearance filed by Jonathan D. Sasser on behalf of C. B.. (Sasser, Jonathan)
July 3, 2019 Filing 11 Affidavit of Service for Complaint and Summons filed by Epic Games, Inc. served on Defendant C.B. on 06/22/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - FedEx Proof of Delivery, #2 Exhibit B- Screenshot of YouTube Video, #3 Exhibit C - Instagram photo) (Thomas, Christopher)
July 2, 2019 Filing 10 Notice of Appearance filed by Catharine B. Arrowood on behalf of Epic Games, Inc.. (Arrowood, Catharine)
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #3 Motion to Seal #2 PROPOSED SEALED Document (Civil Summons). Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 6/20/2019. (Collins, S.)
June 20, 2019 Summons Issued as to C. B. in DE #8 . *NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons issued and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4.* (Collins, S.)
June 20, 2019 Filing 8 SEALED Document: Civil Summons. (Collins, S.)
June 19, 2019 Case Selected for Mediation - A printable list of certified mediators for the Eastern District of North Carolina is available on the court's Website, http://www.nced.uscourts.gov/attorney/mediators.aspx. Please serve this list on all parties. (Horton, B.)
June 18, 2019 Filing 7 Notice of Appearance filed by Catherine R.L. Lawson on behalf of Epic Games, Inc.. (Lawson, Catherine)
June 18, 2019 Filing 6 Notice of Appearance filed by Christopher M. Thomas on behalf of Epic Games, Inc.. (Thomas, Christopher)
June 18, 2019 Filing 5 Financial Disclosure Statement by Epic Games, Inc. (Thomas, Christopher)
June 18, 2019 Filing 4 Memorandum in Support regarding #3 MOTION to Seal #2 PROPOSED SEALED Document (Civil Summons) filed by Epic Games, Inc.. (Thomas, Christopher)
June 18, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Seal #2 PROPOSED SEALED Document (Civil Summons) filed by Epic Games, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Thomas, Christopher)
June 18, 2019 Filing 2 SEALED Document: (Selected Participants Only)by Plaintiff (available to: Defendant C. B., Plaintiff Epic Games, Inc.). (Thomas, Christopher) Modified on 6/20/2019 to seal pursuant to Order #9 . (Collins, S.).
June 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against C. B. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0417-4987414.), filed by Epic Games, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A - Screenshot, #3 Exhibit B - Screenshot discussing cheating, #4 Exhibit C - Epic trademark registrations, #5 Exhibit D - Terms of service, #6 Exhibit E - Fortnite EULA, #7 Exhibit D - Screen print of Defendant's Community page, #8 Exhibit G - Screen print of Defendant's YouTube Community page, #9 Exhibit H - Counter notification (with redaction), #10 Exhibit I - Screen print Defendant's YouTube Community page, #11 Exhibit J - Screen print of Defendant's YouTube Community page, #12 Exhibit K - Screen print of ShopCamDad's Shoppy page, #13 Exhibit L - Screen print of ShopCamDad's Shoppy purchase page, #14 Exhibit M - Screen print of ShopCamDad's Shoppy page, #15 Exhibit N - Screen print of ShopCamDad's Shoppy page, #16 Exhibit O - Screen print of ShopCamDad's Shoppy page, #17 Civil Cover Sheet) (Thomas, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Epic Games, Inc. v. C.B.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Epic Games, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher M. Thomas
Represented By: Catherine R.L. Lawson
Represented By: Catharine B. Arrowood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. B.
Represented By: Jonathan D. Sasser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?