Kardava v. City of Durham
Plaintiff: Janssen Kardava
Defendant: City of Durham
Case Number: 5:2019cv00259
Filed: June 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Louise Wood Flanagan
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 16, 2019 Filing 12 Rule 12 Letter Issued to Janssen Kardava as to #9 MOTION to Dismiss. Response due by 9/9/2019. (Collins, S.)
August 16, 2019 Notice to Counsel regarding: #10 Affidavit. Counsel did not properly identify exhibits pursuant to Section V.E. of the CM/ECF Policies and Procedures Manual (i.e., "Exhibit 1" is not a sufficient description). The deputy clerk corrected the entry. No action by counsel is required. (Collins, S.)
August 15, 2019 Filing 11 Memorandum in Support regarding #9 MOTION to Dismiss filed by City of Durham. (O'Toole, Donald)
August 15, 2019 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT regarding #9 MOTION to Dismiss by City of Durham (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Copy of Summons and Envelope) (O'Toole, Donald) Modified on 8/16/2019 to label exhibit. (Collins, S.).
August 15, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss filed by City of Durham. (O'Toole, Donald)
August 15, 2019 Filing 8 Notice of Appearance filed by Donald T. O'Toole on behalf of City of Durham. (O'Toole, Donald)
July 12, 2019 Filing 7 Duplicate to #6 Financial Disclosure Statement filed by Janssen Kardava. (Attachments: #1 Cover letter, #2 Envelope) (Collins, S.)
July 11, 2019 Filing 6 Financial Disclosure Statement filed by Janssen Kardava. (Tripp, S.)
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER OF DEFICIENCY. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 6/26/2019. (A certified copy of this Order was sent via US mail to Janssen Kardava, 8004 Dukes Dynasty Dr., Raleigh, NC 27615.) (Collins, S.)
June 24, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to City of Durham. Summons issued at intake. (Rudd, D.)
June 24, 2019 Filing 2 Notice of Self-Representation filed by Janssen Kardava. (Rudd, D.)
June 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against City of Durham (Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number RAL072484), filed by Janssen Kardava. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- Letter from U.S. Equal Employment Opportunity Commission, Notice of Suit Rights and Charge of Discrimination, #2 Exhibit 2- Chronology of Events, #3 Exhibit 3- Letter to Human Rescources Department dated 9/12/2016, #4 Exhibit 4- At a glance view of Chronology of relevant events, #5 Exhibit 5- Emails from CBS Manger Maurice Chambers, #6 Exhibit 6- Customer Service Complaints from both internal and external customers, #7 Exhibit 7- Classes/Schools Attended while working at City of Durham, #8 Exhibit 8- Second Retaliation Complaint against Martha Zeigler, #9 Exhibit 9- Email Communication ith Vickie estbrooke, #10 Exhibit 10- Water Management Mandatory Department Training, #11 Exhibit 11- Maria Garraffa and Zelda Jean Johnson, #12 Exhibit 12- FMLA Communication and Documents with HR, #13 Exhibit 13- Retaliation while on FMLA, #14 Exhibit 14- Resignation, #15 Exhibit 15- Felicia Howell and Elizabeth Flythe, #16 Exhibit 16- Disciplinary Action for Pei-Shun Lin, #17 Exhibit 17- POlicies, Procedures and Manuals written by Janssen Kardava from 2015 to 2017, #18 Civil Cover Sheet) (Rudd, D.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kardava v. City of Durham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janssen Kardava
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Durham
Represented By: Donald T. O'Toole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?