Audelo v. Holbrook et al
Plaintiff: Hiran Joshua Audelo
Defendant: Wayne Coats, Jimmy Lee Holbrook and Western Surety Company
Case Number: 5:2019cv00277
Filed: July 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Terrence W Boyle
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #10 Motion to Remand. Signed by Chief Judge Terrence W. Boyle on 7/26/2019. Copy sent to Plaintiff's Counsel Joseph P. Tunstall, III of O'Mally Tunstall, PLLC at Post Office Box 1158, Tarboro, NC 27886 mailed via US Mail on July 26, 2019. (Stouch, L.)
July 26, 2019 Motion Submitted to Chief Judge Terrence W. Boyle regarding #10 MOTION to Remand to State Court. (Stouch, L.)
July 24, 2019 Filing 11 Memorandum in Support regarding #10 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Wayne Coats, Jimmy Lee Holbrook. (Hartzog, Dan)
July 24, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Wayne Coats, Jimmy Lee Holbrook. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Remand) (Hartzog, Dan)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer regarding #1 Notice of Removal. Wayne Coats answer due 8/9/2019; Jimmy Lee Holbrook answer due 8/9/2019. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 7/3/2019. Copy sent via US Mail to to Plaintiff's Counsel Joseph P. Tunstall, III of O'Mally Tunstall, PLLC at Post Office Box 1158, Tarboro, NC27886 mailed via US Mail on July 3, 2019. (Stouch, L.)
July 3, 2019 Motion Referred to Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court regarding #7 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer regarding #1 Notice of Removal. (Stouch, L.)
July 3, 2019 Filing 8 Notice regarding #1 Notice of Removal and requirement to make a Notice of Appearance sent to Plaintiff's Counsel Joseph P. Tunstall, III of O'Mally Tunstall, PLLC at Post Office Box 1158, Tarboro, NC27886 mailed via US Mail on July 3, 2019. (Rudd, D.)
July 3, 2019 Filing 7 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer regarding #1 Notice of Removal,, filed by Wayne Coats, Jimmy Lee Holbrook. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Hartzog, Dan)
July 3, 2019 Filing 6 Financial Disclosure Statement by Wayne Coats (Hartzog, Dan)
July 3, 2019 Filing 5 Financial Disclosure Statement by Jimmy Lee Holbrook (Hartzog, Dan)
July 3, 2019 Filing 4 Notice of Appearance filed by Dan McCord Hartzog, Jr on behalf of Wayne Coats, Jimmy Lee Holbrook. (Hartzog, Dan)
July 3, 2019 Filing 3 Notice filed by Wayne Coats, Jimmy Lee Holbrook regarding #1 Notice of Removal,, Supplemental Cover Sheet. (Hartzog, Dan)
July 3, 2019 Filing 2 Notice filed by Wayne Coats, Jimmy Lee Holbrook regarding #1 Notice of Removal,, Civil Action Cover Sheet. (Hartzog, Dan)
July 3, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Wayne Coats, Jimmy Lee Holbrook from Harnett County Superior Court, case number 19CVS01076. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0417-5007771), filed by Wayne Coats, Jimmy Lee Holbrook. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Civil Action Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit B - Complaint, #3 Exhibit C - Summons - Holbrook, #4 Exhibit D - Summons - Coats, #5 Exhibit E - Ltr to Clerk dated 5-31-19, #6 Exhibit F - Affidavit of Service on Holbrook, #7 Exhibit G - Affidavit of Service on Coats, #8 Exhibit H - Letter to Clerk dated 6-11-19, #9 Exhibit I - Affidavit of Service on Western Surety, #10 Exhibit J - State Court Notice of Removal) (Hartzog, Dan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Audelo v. Holbrook et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wayne Coats
Represented By: Dan McCord Hartzog, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jimmy Lee Holbrook
Represented By: Dan McCord Hartzog, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Western Surety Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hiran Joshua Audelo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?