Bishop v. Virginia Community University
Plaintiff: Jason Bishop
Defendant: Virginia Community University
Case Number: 5:2019cv00281
Filed: July 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Terrence W Boyle
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 19, 2019 Filing 4 JUDGMENT - IT IS ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED plaintiff Jason Bishop's complaint is hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by deputy clerk for Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 8/19/2019. Copy sent via US Mail to Jason Bishop 834 Woodcote Drive, Winston-Salem, NC 27101. (Stouch, L.)
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER regarding #2 Notice of Deficiency. Signed by Chief Judge Terrence W. Boyle on 8/16/2019. Copy sent via US Mail to Jason Bishop 834 Woodcote Drive, Winston-Salem, NC 27101. (Stouch, L.)
August 13, 2019 Motion Submitted to Chief Judge Terrence W. Boyle regarding #1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis along with #2 Order. (Stouch, L.)
July 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER and NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY regarding #1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Jason Bishop. Signed by Magistrate Judge James E. Gates on 7/25/2019. Copy sent via US Mail to Jason Bishop 834 Woodcote Drive, Winston-Salem, NC 27101 with pro se complaint package and forms. (Stouch, L.)
July 9, 2019 Motion Referred to US Magistrate Judge James E. Gates regarding #1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (Stouch, L.)
July 3, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, filed by Jason D. Bishop. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Complaint, #2 Attachments to complaint, #3 Change of Address, #4 Envelope) (Rudd, D.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bishop v. Virginia Community University
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Bishop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Virginia Community University
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?