Young v. Flagship Credit Acceptance, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Trinette Young
Defendant: Flagship Credit Acceptance, LLC and Experian Information Solutions Inc.
Case Number: 5:2019cv00295
Filed: July 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: James C Dever
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 19, 2019 Filing 8 Affidavit of Service for Summons and Complaint filed by Trinette Young served on Experian Information Solutions Inc. on July 19, 2019. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Exhibit A: Affidavit of Service) (Edwards, Asa)
August 9, 2019 Filing 7 Financial Disclosure Statement by Experian Information Solutions Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Experian plc. for Experian Information Solutions Inc.. (Enloe, Caren)
August 9, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Experian Information Solutions Inc.. (Enloe, Caren)
August 9, 2019 Filing 5 Notice of Appearance filed by Caren D. Enloe on behalf of Experian Information Solutions Inc.. (Enloe, Caren)
July 17, 2019 Case Selected for Mediation - A printable list of certified mediators for the Eastern District of North Carolina is available on the court's Website, http://www.nced.uscourts.gov/attorney/mediators.aspx. Please serve this list on all parties. (Sellers, N.)
July 17, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Experian Information Solutions Inc., Flagship Credit Acceptance, LLC. *NOTICE: Counsel shall print the attached summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4.*) (Rudd, D.)
July 16, 2019 Filing 3 Financial Disclosure Statement by Trinette Young (Edwards, Asa)
July 16, 2019 Filing 2 Notice of Appearance filed by Asa Covington Edwards, IV on behalf of Trinette Young. (Edwards, Asa)
July 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0417-5022396.), filed by Trinette Young. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons as to Experian Information Solutions Inc., #3 Proposed Summons as to Flagship Credit Acceptance, LLC) (Edwards, Asa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Young v. Flagship Credit Acceptance, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trinette Young
Represented By: Asa Covington Edwards, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Flagship Credit Acceptance, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions Inc.
Represented By: Caren D. Enloe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?