Hodnett v. American Modern Select Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Allison Hodnett
Defendant: american modern select insurance company
Case Number: 5:2019cv00326
Filed: July 31, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Louise Wood Flanagan
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 27, 2019 Filing 14 Selection of Michael M. Jones as mediator filed by American Modern Select Insurance Company. (Watson, L.)
September 26, 2019 SECOND NOTICE TO COUNSEL - Pursuant to Local ADR Rule 101.1c(a), counsel is reminded that the parties must file a written statement identifying an agreed upon mediator within twenty one (21) days of the entry of the Scheduling Order. If a statement is not timely filed, the Clerk of Court will appoint a mediator from the list of court certified mediators. Selection of Mediator should have been electronically filed on or before 9/25/2019. Parties are directed to immediately comply or file appropriate request for extension. (Collins, S.)
September 4, 2019 NOTICE TO COUNSEL - Pursuant to Local ADR Rule 101.1c(a), counsel is reminded that the parties must file a written statement identifying an agreed upon mediator within twenty one (21) days of the entry of the Scheduling Order. If a statement is not timely filed, the Clerk of Court will appoint a mediator from the list of court certified mediators. Selection of Mediator must be electronically filed on or before 9/25/2019. (Collins, S.)
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Discovery in this case may be governed by a protective order. Discovery due by 6/8/20. Mediation Deadline set for 6/8/20. Motions due by 7/8/20. The parties should review the attached order in its entirety for additional critical deadlines and information. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 9/4/19. (Collins, S.)
August 29, 2019 Filing 12 Rule 26(f) Report (joint) filed by American Modern Select Insurance Company. (Watson, L.)
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 INITIAL ORDER REGARDING PLANNING AND SCHEDULING - Discovery Plan due by 9/13/19. Counsel should read attached order in its entirety for critical information and deadlines. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 8/9/2019. (Collins, S.)
August 8, 2019 Filing 10 Certificate of Service filed by Allison Hodnett regarding #9 Financial Disclosure Statement, #8 Notice of Appearance . (Lorello, Harry)
August 8, 2019 Filing 9 Financial Disclosure Statement by Allison Hodnett (Lorello, Harry)
August 8, 2019 Filing 8 Notice of Appearance filed by Harry Lorello on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Lorello, Harry)
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Refund of Fees Paid Electronically. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 8/7/2019. (A copy of this order has been provided to the Finance Department for submission of refund.) (Collins, S.)
August 7, 2019 Motion Submitted to District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan regarding #4 MOTION for Refund of Fees Paid Electronically. (Collins, S.)
August 6, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint by American Modern Select Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - 3/11/19 Letter to Insured) (Watson, L.)
August 2, 2019 Case Selected for Mediation - A printable list of certified mediators for the Eastern District of North Carolina is available on the court's Website, http://www.nced.uscourts.gov/attorney/mediators.aspx. Please serve this list on all parties. (Collins, S.)
August 2, 2019 Filing 5 Notice regarding #1 Notice of Removal and requirement to make a Notice of Appearance sent to Plaintiff's Counsel Harry Lorello of Everett, Womble & Lawrence at PO Drawer 1678, Goldsboro, NC 25733 mailed via US Mail on August 2, 2019. (Rudd, D.)
August 1, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Refund of Fees Paid Electronically filed by american modern select insurance company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Receipt, #2 Exhibit B - Duplicate Receipt, #3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Watson, L.)
July 31, 2019 Filing 3 Notice of Appearance filed by L. Andrew Watson on behalf of american modern select insurance company. (Watson, L.)
July 31, 2019 Filing 2 Financial Disclosure Statement by american modern select insurance company identifying Corporate Parent American Modern Insurance Group, Inc., Corporate Parent The Midland Company, Corporate Parent american modern Home Insurance Company, Corporate Parent Munchener Ruckversicherungs-Gesellschaft Aktiengesellschaft, Corporate Parent Munich American Holding Corp. for american modern select insurance company. (Watson, L.)
July 31, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by american modern select insurance company from Wayne County Superior Court, case number 19-CVS-1208. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0417-5043668), filed by american modern select insurance company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Supplemental Removal Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit 1 - Complaint, #4 Exhibit 2 - Policy, #5 Exhibit 3 - Notice of Removal to Opposing Counsel, #6 Exhibit 4 - Notice of Filing Notice of Removal) (Watson, L.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hodnett v. American Modern Select Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allison Hodnett
Represented By: Harry Lorello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: american modern select insurance company
Represented By: L. Andrew Watson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?