Genworth Life and Annuity Insurance Company v. Sheridan et al
Plaintiff: Genworth Life and Annuity Insurance Company
Defendant: Ryan C Sheridan, William B Sheridan and Koreen English
Case Number: 5:2019cv00338
Filed: August 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Louise Wood Flanagan
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 5, 2019 Filing 15 Certificate of Service filed by Genworth Life and Annuity Insurance Company regarding #14 Waiver of Service Executed . (Schaefer, Jesse)
September 5, 2019 Filing 14 Waiver of Service Returned Executed filed by Genworth Life and Annuity Insurance Company. Koreen English waiver sent on 9/4/2019, answer due 11/3/2019. (Schaefer, Jesse)
August 26, 2019 Filing 13 Waiver of Service Returned Executed filed by Genworth Life and Annuity Insurance Company. William B Sheridan waiver sent on 8/19/2019, answer due 10/18/2019. (Schaefer, Jesse)
August 26, 2019 Filing 12 Waiver of Service Returned Executed filed by Genworth Life and Annuity Insurance Company. Ryan C Sheridan waiver sent on 8/19/2019, answer due 10/18/2019. (Schaefer, Jesse)
August 19, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL of Motion by Genworth Life and Annuity Insurance Company. Motion for Receipt and Deposit of Interpleader Funds without Prejudice (Schaefer, Jesse) Modified on 8/19/2019 to revise docket text. (Collins, S.).
August 7, 2019 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to Koreen English, Ryan C Sheridan, William B Sheridan. *NOTICE: Counsel shall print the attached summonses and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4.* (Collins, S.)
August 7, 2019 Filing 9 Notice filed by Genworth Life and Annuity Insurance Company regarding #6 Complaint Civil Summons to Ryan Sheridan. (Schaefer, Jesse)
August 7, 2019 Filing 8 Notice filed by Genworth Life and Annuity Insurance Company regarding #6 Complaint Civil Summons to Koreen English. (Schaefer, Jesse)
August 7, 2019 Filing 7 Notice filed by Genworth Life and Annuity Insurance Company regarding #6 Complaint Civil Summons to William Sheridan. (Schaefer, Jesse)
August 7, 2019 Filing 6 COMPLAINT CORRECTED against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 26JATLU0.), filed by Genworth Life and Annuity Insurance Company. (Schaefer, Jesse) Modified on 8/7/2019 (Collins, S.).
August 7, 2019 Notice to Counsel - Counsel is reminded that the court prefers flattened pdf fillable forms. Counsel should "flatten" the proposed summons prior to attaching it in accordance with Section IV.B of the CM/ECF Policies and Procedures Manual. (Rudd, D.)
August 7, 2019 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY regarding #1 Complaint In Interpleader - Counsel needs to refile complaint due to the fact that only page 1 of complaint was filed. (Rudd, D.)
August 6, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Deposit Funds filed by Genworth Life and Annuity Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Schaefer, Jesse)
August 6, 2019 Filing 4 Financial Disclosure Statement by Genworth Life and Annuity Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Genworth Life Insurance Co., Corporate Parent Genworth North America Corp., Corporate Parent Genworth Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Genworth Financial, Inc. for Genworth Life and Annuity Insurance Company. (Schaefer, Jesse)
August 6, 2019 Filing 3 Notice of Appearance filed by Elizabeth J. Bondurant on behalf of Genworth Life and Annuity Insurance Company. (Bondurant, Elizabeth)
August 6, 2019 Filing 2 Notice of Appearance filed by Jesse A. Schaefer on behalf of Genworth Life and Annuity Insurance Company. (Schaefer, Jesse)
August 6, 2019 Filing 1 **CORRECTED AND REFILED AT #6 ** COMPLAINT IN INTERPLEADER against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0417-5051145.), filed by Genworth Life and Annuity Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons William Sheridan, #3 Proposed Summons Koreen English, #4 Proposed Summons Ryan Sheridan) (Schaefer, Jesse) Modified on 8/7/2019 (Collins, S.). (Attachment 2, 3 and 4 flattened and replaced on 8/8/2019) (Edwards, S.).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Genworth Life and Annuity Insurance Company v. Sheridan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryan C Sheridan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William B Sheridan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Koreen English
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Genworth Life and Annuity Insurance Company
Represented By: Elizabeth J. Bondurant
Represented By: Jesse A. Schaefer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?