Equal Employment Opportunity Commission v. PAR Ventures, Inc.
Plaintiff: Equal Employment Opportunity Commission
Defendant: PAR Ventures, Inc. d/b/a McDonald's and PAR Ventures, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2019cv00341
Filed: August 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Louise Wood Flanagan
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 23, 2019 Filing 7 Waiver of Service Returned Executed filed by Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. PAR Ventures, Inc. waiver sent on 8/7/2019, answer due 10/6/2019. (Mahood, Zoe)
August 29, 2019 Filing 6 Notice of Appearance filed by James Michael Honeycutt on behalf of All Defendants. (Honeycutt, James)
August 29, 2019 Filing 5 Notice of Appearance filed by Deven Shavon Gray on behalf of All Defendants. (Gray, Deven)
August 8, 2019 Case Selected for Mediation - A printable list of certified mediators for the Eastern District of North Carolina is available on the court's Website, http://www.nced.uscourts.gov/attorney/mediators.aspx. Please serve this list on all parties. (Collins, S.)
August 7, 2019 Filing 4 Notice of Appearance filed by Zoe G. Mahood on behalf of Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. (Mahood, Zoe)
August 7, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to John Parker on 08/07/2019 by Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. Waiver of Service due by 9/9/2019. (Attachments: #1 Waiver of Service of Summons) (Mahood, Zoe)
August 7, 2019 Filing 2 Notice filed by Equal Employment Opportunity Commission Civil Cover Sheet. (Mahood, Zoe)
August 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against PAR Ventures, Inc. d/b/a McDonald's, filed by Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. (Mahood, Zoe)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Equal Employment Opportunity Commission v. PAR Ventures, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Equal Employment Opportunity Commission
Represented By: Zoe G. Mahood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PAR Ventures, Inc. d/b/a McDonald's
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PAR Ventures, Inc.
Represented By: Deven Shavon Gray
Represented By: James Michael Honeycutt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?