Ferruccio v. Davis
Plaintiff: Deborah Ferruccio
Defendant: Tare Davis
Case Number: 5:2019cv00346
Filed: August 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Terrence W Boyle
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 4, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Withdraw #9 Order for Discovery Plan filed by Tare Davis. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Garcia-Gallont, Rudolf)
October 3, 2019 Notice to Counsel regarding: #11 Response to Motion. CM/ECF does not accommodate certain document combinations, such as 'response and reply' or 'responses and motion'. Counsel is directed to re-file the document using separate docket entries and must use a motion event to file a motion, attaching a proposed order. (Stouch, L.)
October 3, 2019 Filing 11 RESPONSE to Motion regarding #10 MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint,,, Defendant's Response to Plaintiff's Motion to Amend Complaint and Motion for Withdrawal of Order for Discovery Plan filed by Tare Davis. (Garcia-Gallont, Rudolf)
September 19, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Amend #1 Complaint filed by Deborah Ferruccio. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Letter from Tare Davis to Noise Ordinance Task Force, #2 Exhibit 2 - Proposed Amended Complaint) (Stouch, L.)
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER FOR DISCOVERY PLAN sent to all parties. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 9/9/2019. Copy sent via US Mail to Deborah Ferruccio, 297 Davis-Hyman Rd., Norlina, NC 27563. (Stouch, L.)
September 9, 2019 Filing 8 Financial Disclosure Statement by Tare Davis (Garcia-Gallont, Rudolf)
September 9, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Tare Davis. (Garcia-Gallont, Rudolf)
September 9, 2019 Filing 6 Notice of Appearance filed by Rudolf A. Garcia-Gallont on behalf of Tare Davis. (Garcia-Gallont, Rudolf)
August 8, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Tare Davis. Summons issued at intake. (Rudd, D.)
August 8, 2019 Filing 3 Financial Disclosure Statement filed by Deborah Ferruccio. (Rudd, D.)
August 8, 2019 Filing 2 Notice of Self-Representation filed by Deborah Ferruccio. (Rudd, D.)
August 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Tare Davis (Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number RAL073422), filed by Deborah Ferruccio. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- Warren County Ordinance for the Regulation of Sound Crossing Real Property Boundaries, #2 Exhibit 2- Photograph of Plaintiff's Road with Security, #3 Exhibit 3- Map of Plaintiff's and Afton Area Property, #4 Exhibit 4- Plaintiff's Shared Farm Road, known as Davis-Hyman Road, #5 Exhibit 5- Photograph of Plaintiff's Property, #6 Exhibit 6- Facebook Cyber Threat to Ferruccios filed as to Complaint to FBI, #7 Exhibit 7- Notice of Decision, #8 Exhibit 8- 4/18/2018 Work Session/Meeting Item #7-A Recommendations from County Attorney, #9 Civil Cover Sheet) (Rudd, D.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ferruccio v. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tare Davis
Represented By: Rudolf A. Garcia-Gallont
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deborah Ferruccio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?