Blount v. Ingram
Plaintiff: Gladys Blount
Defendant: Samantha Jones Ingram
Case Number: 5:2019cv00347
Filed: August 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Louise Wood Flanagan
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1442
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER denying #10 Plaintiff's Consolidated Motion for No-Contact Order for Stalking Misconduct Protecting Plaintiff DOD(EA) Whistle Blower Blount and Notice of Appearance of Plaintiff DOD(EA) Whistle Blower Blount for Case Already in Session Before Eastern District Court. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 9/26/2019. (Pro se party has consented to receiving electronic service of all motions, notices, orders, and documents in civil cases in the Eastern District of North Carolina.) (Collins, S.)
September 24, 2019 Filing 19 RESPONSE in Opposition regarding #17 PLAINTIFF'S DISABUSE OF DEFENDANTS MOTIONS & NON-PRIMARY SOURCES PLACED IN PLAINTIFF'S RECORD BY DEFENDANT BETWEEN THE DATES OF SEPTEMBER 19, 2019 FOR PLAINTIFF DOD(EA) WHISTLE BLOWER BLOUNT FOR CASE ALREADY IN SESSION BEFORE EASTERN DISTRICT COURT filed by Samantha Jones Ingram. (Fowler, Neal) Modified on 9/24/2019 to clarify docket text. (Tripp, S.).
September 24, 2019 Filing 18 RESPONSE in Opposition regarding #11 Plaintiff's Disabuse of Notice of Correction Action Dated August 27, 2019 of Plaintiff DOD(EA) Whistle Blower Blount for Case Already In Session Before Eastern District Court filed by Samantha Jones Ingram. (Fowler, Neal) Modified on 9/24/2019 to clarify docket text. (Tripp, S.).
September 23, 2019 Motion Submitted to District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan regarding #10 Plaintiff's Consolidated Motion for No-Contact Order for Stalking Misconduct Protecting Plaintiff DOD(EA) Whistle Blower Blount and Notice of Appearance of Plaintiff DOD(EA) Whistle Blower Blount for Case Already in Session Before Eastern District Court. (Collins, S.)
September 23, 2019 Filing 17 PLAINTIFF'S DISABUSE OF DEFENDANTS MOTIONS & NON-PRIMARY SOURCES PLACED IN PLAINTIFF'S RECORD BY DEFENDANT BETWEEN THE DATES OF SEPTEMBER 19, 2019 FOR PLAINTIFF DOD(EA) WHISTLE BLOWER BLOUNT FOR CASE ALREADY IN SESSION BEFORE EASTERN DISTRICT COURT regarding #10 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order, MOTION to Remand filed by Gladys Blount. (Attachments: #1 List of Exhibits, #2 Plaintiff's Exhibit 6.1, #3 Emails 1-25-11, #4 Exhibit Center for Public Integrity Media Query, #5 Envelope) (Collins, S.)
September 19, 2019 Filing 16 RESPONSE in Opposition regarding #10 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION to Remand filed by Samantha Jones Ingram. (Fowler, Neal)
September 16, 2019 Filing 15 Rule 12 Letter Issued to Plaintiff regarding #12 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM, MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction - Responses due by 10/7/2019. (Tripp, S.)
September 16, 2019 Filing 14 Notice filed by Samantha Jones Ingram (Certificate of Scope of Employment and Substitution). (Fowler, Neal)
September 16, 2019 Filing 13 Memorandum in Support regarding #12 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Samantha Jones Ingram. (Fowler, Neal)
September 16, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Samantha Jones Ingram. (Fowler, Neal)
September 10, 2019 Notice of Pro Se E-Noticing - Pro se party has consented to receiving electronic service of all motions, notices, orders, and documents in civil cases in the Eastern District of North Carolina. All documents filed in CM-ECF will be served on this party via email pursuant to Rule 5 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Civil Rule 5.1. (Collins, S.)
September 6, 2019 Filing 11 Plaintiff's Disabuse of Notice of Correction Action Dated August 27, 2019 of Plaintiff DOD(EA) Whistle Blower Blount for Case Already In Session Before Eastern District Court filed by Gladys Blount regarding #10 Plaintiff's Consolidated Motion for No-Contact Order for Stalking Misconduct Protecting Plaintiff DOD(EA) Whistle Blower Blount and Notice of Appearance of Plaintiff DOD(EA) Whistle Blower Blount for Case Already in Session Before Eastern District Court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Civil Summons - No Contact Order for Stalking, #2 Exhibit 2 - Beaufort Gazette, #3 Exhibit 3 - Email Chain from October 29, 2010 through November 15, 2017, #4 Exhibit 4 - DoD IG Report, #5 Exhibit 5 - Proof of Service, #6 Exhibit 6 - PACER Documents and Consent to Electronic Service, #7 Envelope) (Tripp, S.)
August 30, 2019 Filing 10 Plaintiff's Consolidated Motion for No-Contact Order for Stalking Misconduct Protecting Plaintiff DOD(EA) Whistle Blower Blount and Notice of Appearance of Plaintiff DOD(EA) Whistle Blower Blount for Case Already in Session Before Eastern District Court filed by Gladys Blount. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Civil Summons no contact order, #2 Exhibit Beaufort Gazette article, #3 Exhibit Email chain, #4 Exhibit DoD IG Report, #5 Envelope) (Collins, S.)
August 30, 2019 Filing 9 Financial Disclosure Statement filed by Gladys Blount. (Collins, S.)
August 30, 2019 Filing 8 Notice of Self-Representation filed by Gladys Blount. (Collins, S.)
August 27, 2019 Filing 7 Letter from S. Collins, Deputy Clerk to Gladys Blount following up on letter dated 8/9/19 requesting notice of self representation and financial disclosure statement forms. (Collins, S.)
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer regarding #1 Notice of Removal. Samantha Jones Ingram answer due 9/16/2019. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 8/13/2019. (A certified copy of this Order was sent via US mail to Gladys Blount, 8229 Frenchorn Lane, Fayetteville, NC 28314.) (Collins, S.)
August 12, 2019 Motion Referred to Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court regarding #5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer regarding #1 Notice of Removal. (Collins, S.)
August 12, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer regarding #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Samantha Jones Ingram. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Fowler, Neal)
August 12, 2019 Filing 4 Notice filed by Samantha Jones Ingram (Letter to Cumberland County Clerk of Court dated August 8, 2019). (Fowler, Neal)
August 9, 2019 Filing 3 Notice regarding #1 Notice of Removal and requirement to file a Notice of Self Representation sent to Pro Se Plaintiff Gladys Blount at 8229 Frenchorn Lane, Fayetteville, NC 28314 mailed via US mail on August 9, 2019. A copy of notice along with a blank notice of self representation and a blank financial disclosure statement. (Rudd, D.)
August 8, 2019 Filing 2 Notice of Appearance filed by Neal Fowler on behalf of Samantha Jones Ingram. (Fowler, Neal)
August 8, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Samantha Jones Ingram from District Court - Cumberland County, case number 19 CVD 3037., filed by Samantha Jones Ingram. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Summons, Complaint, Order for Samantha Jones Ingram, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Supplement Supplemental Cover Removal Coversheet) (Fowler, Neal)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Blount v. Ingram
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gladys Blount
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samantha Jones Ingram
Represented By: Neal Fowler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?