McPhail v. Fresenius Health Partners, Inc.
Plaintiff: Douglas E. McPhail
Defendant: Fresenius Health Partners, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2019cv00350
Filed: August 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Louise Wood Flanagan
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2019 Filing 8 JUDGMENT - In accordance with the court's order entered September 10, 2019, and for the reasons set forth more specifically therein, that this action is dismissed WITHOUT PREJUDICE and plaintiff's motion for TRO and preliminary injunction is DENIED. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 9/10/2019. (Collins, S.)
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER adopting Report and Recommendations re #3 Memorandum and Recommendations. Plaintiff's complaint is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE, and plaintiff's motion for TRO and preliminary injunction is DENIED. The clerk of court is DIRECTED to close the case. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 9/10/2019. (A certified copy of this Order was sent via US mail to Douglas E. McPhail, 615 Kellam Circle, Fayetteville, NC 28311.) (Collins, S.)
August 22, 2019 Filing 6 Financial Disclosure Statement filed by Douglas E. McPhail. (Collins, S.)
August 22, 2019 Filing 5 Notice of Self-Representation filed by Douglas E. McPhail. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (Collins, S.)
August 21, 2019 Filing 4 COMPLAINT against Fresenius Health Partners, Inc. filed by Douglas E. McPhail. (Collins, S.)
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER and MEMORANDUM AND RECOMMENDATIONS regarding #1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Douglas E. McPhail. Objections to Order and Memorandum and Recommendations due by 9/4/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert B. Jones, Jr on 8/21/2019. (A certified copy of this Order and M&R was sent via US mail to Douglas E. McPhail, 615 Kellam Circle,Fayetteville, NC 28311.) (Collins, S.)
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER OF DEFICIENCY. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert B. Jones, Jr on 8/14/2019. (A certified copy of this Order was sent via US mail to Douglas E. McPhail, 615 Kellam Circle, Fayetteville, NC 28311 with blank notice of self representation and financial disclosure forms.) (Collins, S.)
August 14, 2019 Motion Referred to US Magistrate Judge Robert B. Jones, Jr regarding #1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (Collins, S.)
August 12, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, filed by Douglas E. McPhail. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction, #5 Brief in Support of Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction, #6 Motion for Service of Process, #7 Text of Proposed Order, #8 Cover Letter, #9 Envelope) (Rudd, D.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McPhail v. Fresenius Health Partners, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fresenius Health Partners, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Douglas E. McPhail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?