Thomas v. Retrieval Masters Credit Bureau Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Pernell Thomas
Defendant: Retrieval Masters Credit Bureau Inc., Inform Diagnostics Inc. and Laboratory Corporation of America Holdings
Case Number: 5:2019cv00352
Filed: August 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: James C Dever
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 29, 2019 Case has been opened in District of New Jersey as case 2:19-cv-17367. (Sellers, N.)
August 28, 2019 Case transferred to District of New Jersey. File transmitted electronically. (Sellers, N.)
August 27, 2019 Filing 7 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER - This case is transferred under 28 U.S.C. 1407 to the District of New Jersey for the reasons stated in the order of July 31, 2019, and, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Madeline C. Arleo. Signed by John W. Nichols, Clerk of the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. (Stay lifted on 8/27/2019.) (Sellers, N.)
August 21, 2019 Case Selected for Mediation - A printable list of certified mediators for the Eastern District of North Carolina is available on the court's Website, http://www.nced.uscourts.gov/attorney/mediators.aspx. Please serve this list on all parties. (Sellers, N.)
August 14, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Inform Diagnostics Inc., Laboratory Corporation of America Holdings, Retrieval Masters Credit Bureau Inc. (*NOTICE: Counsel shall print the attached summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4.*) (Sellers, N.)
August 14, 2019 Filing 5 Financial Disclosure Statement by Pernell Thomas (Schwaba, Andrew)
August 14, 2019 Filing 4 Notice of Appearance filed by Andrew J. Schwaba on behalf of Pernell Thomas. (Schwaba, Andrew)
August 14, 2019 Filing 3 Notice filed by Pernell Thomas regarding #1 Complaint Civil Cover Sheet. (Schwaba, Andrew)
August 14, 2019 Filing 2 Notice filed by Pernell Thomas regarding #1 Complaint Proposed Summons. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 Proposed Summons) (Schwaba, Andrew)
August 14, 2019 Notice to Counsel - No Summons provided for issuance or Waiver of Service filed. (Rudd, D.)
August 14, 2019 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY regarding #1 Complaint - Counsel failed to file a JS44 Civil Cover Sheet as required by the Court. Counsel should file a cover sheet using the event "Notice-Other" as soon as possible. (Rudd, D.)
August 14, 2019 Notice to Counsel - All Counsel shall file a Notice of Appearance pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.2(a). (Rudd, D.)
August 14, 2019 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY - Failure to File Financial Disclosure Statement as to Pernell Thomas. Pursuant to 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Civil Rule 7.3, all parties shall file a financial disclosure statement. A negative statement is required if a party has no disclosures to make. The disclosure statement must be on a form provided by the clerk. This form is available at the clerk's office and on the court's website. (Rudd, D.)
August 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 26JFTDPF.), filed by Pernell Thomas. (Schwaba, Andrew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thomas v. Retrieval Masters Credit Bureau Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Retrieval Masters Credit Bureau Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Inform Diagnostics Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laboratory Corporation of America Holdings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pernell Thomas
Represented By: Andrew J. Schwaba
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?