H&E Equipment Services, Inc. v. Oak City Contracting, LLC et al
Plaintiff: H&E Equipment Services, Inc.
Defendant: Oak City Contracting, LLC and Dustin Crittenden
Case Number: 5:2019cv00361
Filed: August 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Louise Wood Flanagan
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 3, 2019 Filing 11 Affidavit of Service for Summons and Complaint filed by H&E Equipment Services, Inc. served on Dustin Crittenden on 9/26/2019. (Harris, Jason)
October 3, 2019 Filing 10 Notice filed by H&E Equipment Services, Inc. . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Service) (Harris, Jason)
October 3, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Entry of Default as to Oak City Contracting, LLC filed by H&E Equipment Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Statement of Resignation of Registered Agent, #2 Proposed Entry of Default) (Harris, Jason)
October 3, 2019 Filing 8 Affidavit of Service for Summons and Complaint as to Oak City Contracting, LLC filed by H&E Equipment Services, Inc. served on Oak City Contracting, LLC on 08/26/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - USPS Certified Mail Delivery Confirmation) (Harris, Jason)
August 23, 2019 Notice to Counsel regarding: #7 Notice of Change of Address, #6 Notice of Change of Address. Attorney's are responsible for updating their contact information within CM/ECF. Counsel should refer to Pages 5 and 6 of the CM/ECF User's Manual for instructions on updating law firm information. Once updated, the new contact information will be reflected on the docket of all cases in which counsel entered an appearance. (Collins, S.)
August 23, 2019 Filing 7 Notice of Change of Address filed by Rebecca Ann Knudson filed by on behalf of H&E Equipment Services, Inc.. (Knudson, Rebecca)
August 23, 2019 Filing 6 Notice of Change of Address filed by Jason R. Harris filed by on behalf of H&E Equipment Services, Inc.. (Harris, Jason)
August 22, 2019 Case Selected for Mediation - A printable list of certified mediators for the Eastern District of North Carolina is available on the court's Website, http://www.nced.uscourts.gov/attorney/mediators.aspx. Please serve this list on all parties. (Collins, S.)
August 22, 2019 Notice to Counsel regarding: #3 Notice of Appearance, #2 Notice of Appearance. The mailing address on these documents do not match the contact information in CM/ECF. Counsel should refer to Pages 5 and 6 of the CM/ECF User's Manual for instructions on updating law firm information. Once updated, the new contact information will be reflected on the docket of all cases in which counsel entered an appearance. (Collins, S.)
August 22, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Dustin Crittenden, Oak City Contracting, LLC. *NOTICE: Counsel shall print the attached summonses and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4.* (Collins, S.)
August 20, 2019 Filing 4 Financial Disclosure Statement by H&E Equipment Services, Inc. (Harris, Jason)
August 20, 2019 Filing 3 Notice of Appearance filed by Rebecca Ann Knudson on behalf of H&E Equipment Services, Inc.. (Knudson, Rebecca)
August 20, 2019 Filing 2 Notice of Appearance filed by Jason R. Harris on behalf of H&E Equipment Services, Inc.. (Harris, Jason)
August 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Dustin Crittenden, Oak City Contracting, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0417-5070288.), filed by H&E Equipment Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Application for Credit and Contract, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Proposed Civil Summons - Oak City Contracting, LLC, #4 Proposed Civil Summons - Dustin Crittenden) (Harris, Jason)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: H&E Equipment Services, Inc. v. Oak City Contracting, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: H&E Equipment Services, Inc.
Represented By: Rebecca Ann Knudson
Represented By: Jason R. Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oak City Contracting, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dustin Crittenden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?