State Farm Fire and Casualty Company v. Techtronic Industries North America, Inc.
Plaintiff: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company, as subrogee of Scott Daugherty and State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Defendant: Techtronic Industries North America, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2019cv00415
Filed: September 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: W Earl Britt
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 13, 2019 Referred #17 Rule 26(f) Report to US Magistrate Judge James E. Gates for entry of scheduling order. (Herrmann, L.)
November 13, 2019 Case Selected for Mediation - A printable list of certified mediators for the Eastern District of North Carolina is available on the court's Website, http://www.nced.uscourts.gov/attorney/mediators.aspx. Please serve this list on all parties. (Herrmann, L.)
November 12, 2019 Filing 17 Rule 26(f) Report (joint) filed by Techtronic Industries North America, Inc.. (Warner, Kirk)
October 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER FOR DISCOVERY PLAN sent to all parties. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 10/23/2019. Copy sent to William L. Nimick, Law Offices of Stephen R. Paul, P.O. Box 16099, Chapel Hill, NC 27516 via US Mail. (Edwards, S.)
October 22, 2019 Filing 15 Notice of Appearance filed by William L. Nimick on behalf of State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (Nimick, William)
October 9, 2019 Filing 14 Notice of Appearance filed by William L. Nimick on behalf of State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (Herrmann, L.)
October 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Leave to File in Paper Form. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 10/9/2019. (Herrmann, L.)
October 8, 2019 Motion Referred to Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court: #12 MOTION for Leave to File in Paper Form. (Herrmann, L.)
October 8, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Leave to File in Paper Form filed by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Envelope) (Herrmann, L.)
October 2, 2019 Filing 11 Financial Disclosure Statement filed by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company identifying Corporate Parent State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company for State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (Herrmann, L.)
October 2, 2019 Filing 10 Notice of Appearance filed by Stephen R. Paul on behalf of State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (Herrmann, L.)
October 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Leave to File in Paper Form. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 10/2/2019. (Herrmann, L.)
October 2, 2019 Motion Referred to US Magistrate Judge James E. Gates: #8 MOTION for Leave to File in Paper Form. (Herrmann, L.)
October 1, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to File in Paper Form filed by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Envelope) (Herrmann, L.)
September 25, 2019 Filing 7 Notice of Special Appearance for non-district by Christopher C. Yearout on behalf of Techtronic Industries North America, Inc.. (Yearout, Christopher)
September 20, 2019 Filing 6 Notice regarding #1 Notice of Removal and requirement to make a Notice of Appearance sent to Plaintiff's Counsel Stephen R. Paul, of THE LAW OFFICES OF STEPHEN R. PAUL at P.O. Box 16099, Chapel Hill, North Carolina 27516-6099 mailed via US Mail on September 20, 2019. (Rudd, D.)
September 18, 2019 Filing 5 Notice of Appearance filed by Christopher R. Kiger on behalf of Techtronic Industries North America, Inc.. (Kiger, Christopher)
September 18, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint by Techtronic Industries North America, Inc.. (Warner, Kirk)
September 18, 2019 Filing 3 Notice of Appearance filed by Kirk G. Warner on behalf of Techtronic Industries North America, Inc.. (Warner, Kirk)
September 18, 2019 Filing 2 Financial Disclosure Statement by Techtronic Industries North America, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Techtronic Industries Company, Ltd. for Techtronic Industries North America, Inc.. (Warner, Kirk)
September 18, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Techtronic Industries North America, Inc. from Wake County Superior Court, case number 19 CVS 10946. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0417-5108873), filed by Techtronic Industries North America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Summons, #2 Exhibit B - State Court Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit C - Complaint, #4 Exhibit D - Notice Letter, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Supplemental Removal Cover Sheet) (Warner, Kirk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company v. Techtronic Industries North America, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Techtronic Industries North America, Inc.
Represented By: Kirk G. Warner
Represented By: Christopher R. Kiger
Represented By: Christopher C. Yearout
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company, as subrogee of Scott Daugherty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Represented By: William L. Nimick
Represented By: Stephen R. Paul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?