Spain v. Pilot Mountain Ford, Inc.
Plaintiff: Malinda Spain
Defendant: Pilot Mountain Ford, Inc.. and Pilot Mountain Ford, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2019cv00416
Filed: September 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Malcolm J Howard
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 47:222
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 15, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Pilot Mountain Ford, Inc.. (Doughton, Thomas)
October 21, 2019 Filing 6 Affidavit of Service for Summons, Complaint and Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations filed by Malinda Spain served on Pilot Mountain Ford on September 26, 2019. (Wilkerson, David)
October 16, 2019 TEXT ORDER granting Defendant's unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint #5 . For good cause shown, it is ordered that Defendant has up to and including November 15, 2019, within which to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint #1 . Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 10/16/2019. (Hockaday, A.)
October 16, 2019 Motion Referred to Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court regarding #5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer regarding #1 Complaint. (Rudd, D.)
October 16, 2019 Notice to Counsel - Counsel is to file a Notice of Appearance pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.2(a). (Rudd, D.)
October 16, 2019 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY - Failure to File Financial Disclosure Statement as to Pilot Mountain Ford, Inc. Pursuant to 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Civil Rule 7.3, all parties shall file a financial disclosure statement. A negative statement is required if a party has no disclosures to make. The disclosure statement must be on a form provided by the clerk. This form is available at the clerk's office and on the court's website. (Rudd, D.)
October 16, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer regarding #1 Complaint filed by Pilot Mountain Ford, Inc... (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Doughton, Thomas)
September 20, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Pilot Mountain Ford, Inc. (*NOTICE: Counsel shall print the attached summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4.*) (Rudd, D.)
September 18, 2019 Filing 3 Financial Disclosure Statement by Malinda Spain (Wilkerson, David)
September 18, 2019 Filing 2 Notice of Appearance filed by David Matthew Wilkerson on behalf of Malinda Spain. (Wilkerson, David)
September 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Class Action Complaint against Pilot Mountain Ford, Inc.. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0417-5108960.), filed by Malinda Spain. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Wilkerson, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Spain v. Pilot Mountain Ford, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pilot Mountain Ford, Inc..
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pilot Mountain Ford, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas J. Doughton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Malinda Spain
Represented By: David Matthew Wilkerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?