The Prudential Insurance Company of America v. Stewart, et al
Plaintiff: The Prudential Insurance Company of America
Defendant: Jessica Stewart and Nicholas A. Stewart
Case Number: 5:2019cv00419
Filed: September 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: James C Dever
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 15, 2019 Filing 12 Declaration regarding #11 MOTION for Entry of Default Against Nicholas A. Stewart by The Prudential Insurance Company of America (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- Email from K. Morrison) (Worley, Benjamin)
November 15, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Entry of Default Against Nicholas A. Stewart filed by The Prudential Insurance Company of America. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Entry of Default) (Worley, Benjamin)
October 28, 2019 Filing 10 Affidavit of Service for Summons and Complaint filed by The Prudential Insurance Company of America served on Nicholas Stewart on 10/08/2019. (Worley, Benjamin)
October 24, 2019 Notice to Counsel - Defendant is appearing pro se. Pursuant to Local ADR Rule 101.1a(b), cases wherein the United States is a party or any party appears pro se are not subject to mandatory mediation. This case is no longer subject to mandatory mediation. (Sellers, N.)
October 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Jessica Stewart answer due 12/20/2019. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 10/21/2019. Sent to Jessica Stewart at 1136 Patrick Drive Fayetteville, NC 28314 via US Mail. (Sellers, N.)
October 21, 2019 Motion Referred to Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court regarding #8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer. (Sellers, N.)
October 21, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Jessica Stewart. (Sellers, N.)
October 21, 2019 Filing 7 Financial Disclosure Statement filed by Jessica Stewart. (Sellers, N.)
October 21, 2019 Filing 6 Notice of Self-Representation filed by Jessica Stewart (Attachments: #1 Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, #2 Envelope) (Sellers, N.)
October 7, 2019 Filing 5 Affidavit of Service for Summons and Complaint filed by The Prudential Insurance Company of America served on Jessica Stewart on 09/30/2019. (Worley, Benjamin)
October 2, 2019 Case Selected for Mediation - A printable list of certified mediators for the Eastern District of North Carolina is available on the court's Website, http://www.nced.uscourts.gov/attorney/mediators.aspx. Please serve this list on all parties. (Sellers, N.)
September 20, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Jessica Stewart, Nicholas A. Stewart. (*NOTICE: Counsel shall print the attached summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4.*) (Rudd, D.)
September 20, 2019 Notice to Counsel regarding: DE #[1-5] Civil Cover Sheet, DE #[1-6] Proposed Summons, DE #[1-7] Proposed Summons, DE #2 Notice of Appearance, and DE #3 Financial Disclosure Statement. Counsel is reminded that the court prefers flattened pdf fillable forms. Counsel should "flatten" the civil cover sheet, proposed summons, notice of appearance and financial disclosure statement prior to attaching it in accordance with Section to IV.B of the CM/ECF Policies and Procedures Manual. No other action is needed at this time. (Rudd, D.)
September 19, 2019 Filing 3 Financial Disclosure Statement by The Prudential Insurance Company of America identifying Corporate Parent Prudential Financial, Inc. for The Prudential Insurance Company of America. (Worley, Benjamin)
September 19, 2019 Filing 2 Notice of Appearance filed by Benjamin L. Worley on behalf of The Prudential Insurance Company of America. (Worley, Benjamin)
September 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT For Interpleader against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0417-5110625.), filed by The Prudential Insurance Company of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Life Insurance Policy, #2 Exhibit B- Death Certificate, #3 Exhibit C-Claim for Death Benefits, #4 Exhibit D- Department of Defense Report of Result of Trial, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Proposed Summons Summons for Jessica Stewart, #7 Proposed Summons Summons for Nicholas A. Stewart) (Worley, Benjamin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Prudential Insurance Company of America v. Stewart, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Prudential Insurance Company of America
Represented By: Benjamin L. Worley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jessica Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nicholas A. Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?