Masi v. Mythical Entertainment
Plaintiff: Alessandro Masi
Defendant: Mythical Entertainment
Case Number: 5:2019cv00438
Filed: September 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Louise Wood Flanagan
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 20, 2019 Filing 18 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Mythical Entertainment, filed by Alessandro Masi. (Attachments: #1 Index Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A: Copyrighted Photograph, #3 Exhibit B: Screenshot from Slate, an authorized licensee, #4 Exhibit C: Screenshots of Defendant's Infringing Use) (Liebowitz, Richard)
November 20, 2019 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY regarding #17 Amended Complaint. Counsel did not properly identify exhibits pursuant to Section V.E. of the CM/ECF Policies and Procedures Manual (i.e., "Exhibit A" is not a sufficient description). Additionally, when filing a document with more than five exhibits, the first attached exhibit must be an index of all of the subsequent attached documents. Counsel is directed to refile. (Collins, S.)
November 19, 2019 Filing 17 **CORRECTED AND REFILED AT #18 ** AMENDED COMPLAINT against Mythical Entertainment, filed by Alessandro Masi. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C) (Liebowitz, Richard) Modified on 11/20/2019 (Collins, S.).
November 13, 2019 Filing 16 RESPONSE to Order regarding #15 Order to Show Cause, filed by Alessandro Masi. (Liebowitz, Richard)
October 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Mr. Liebowitz is ORDERED TO SHOW CAUSE, on or before November 13, 2019, why he should not be disqualified from representing the plaintiff. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 10/29/2019. (Collins, S.)
October 29, 2019 Filing 14 Memorandum in Support regarding #13 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Mythical Entertainment. (Thomas, Christopher)
October 29, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Mythical Entertainment. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Screen print from US Copyright Office, #2 Exhibit 2 - Search results from PACER) (Thomas, Christopher)
October 29, 2019 Filing 12 Financial Disclosure Statement by Mythical Entertainment identifying Corporate Parent Lillington Basement, Inc. for Mythical Entertainment. (Thomas, Christopher)
October 29, 2019 Filing 11 Notice of Appearance filed by Christopher M. Thomas on behalf of Mythical Entertainment. (Thomas, Christopher)
October 18, 2019 Filing 10 Notice of Special Appearance for non-district by Richard P. Liebowitz on behalf of Alessandro Masi. (Liebowitz, Richard)
October 18, 2019 Filing 9 **CORRECTED AND REFILED AT #10 ** Notice of Special Appearance for non-district by Albert P. Allan on behalf of Alessandro Masi. (Allan, Albert) Modified on 10/25/2019 (Collins, S.).
October 18, 2019 Filing 8 Notice of Appearance filed by Albert P. Allan on behalf of Alessandro Masi. (Allan, Albert)
October 11, 2019 Motion Submitted to District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan regarding #4 MOTION for Extension of Time to comply with L.R. 83.1(d). (Collins, S.)
October 10, 2019 Filing 7 Notice filed by Alessandro Masi regarding #3 Order, . (Liebowitz, Richard)
October 10, 2019 Filing 6 Financial Disclosure Statement by Alessandro Masi (Liebowitz, Richard)
October 10, 2019 Filing 5 COMPLAINT against Mythical Entertainment (Filing fee $ 400.), filed by Alessandro Masi. (Attachments: #1 Index Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A: Copyrighted Photograph, #3 Exhibit B: Screenshots from Slate, an authorized licensee, #4 Exhibit C: Screenshots of Defendant's Infringing Use, #5 Exhibit D: Requested Summons, #6 Exhibit E: Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Exhibit F: Copyright Notice Form AO-121) (Liebowitz, Richard)
October 10, 2019 Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number RAL074637 (Collins, S.)
October 9, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Extension of Time to comply with L.R. 83.1(d) filed by Alessandro Masi. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Liebowitz, Richard)
October 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER - This attorney is noticed that he has until October 10, 2019, to cure any and every noticed deficiency in the three cases now assigned to me. If no address is made in accordance with this order, the cases at issue will be dismissed. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 10/4/2019. (Collins, S.)
October 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order - At the direction of the Court, and for the continued efficient administration of justice, the above-captioned case is redesignated as a Western Division case. The Honorable Louise Wood Flanagan, United States District Judge, will remain the presiding judge. All future documents shall reflect the new case number of 5:19-CV-438-FL. No further filing shall be made in 2:19-CV-31-FL. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 10/2/2019. (Collins, S.)
October 2, 2019 Case transferred in from Northern Division on 10/02/2019. Case Number 2:19-cv-31-FL. (Collins, S.)
October 1, 2019 Notice to Counsel - Counsel should file a Notice of Appearance pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.2(a). (Collins, S.)
October 1, 2019 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY regarding #1 Complaint. Counsel did not properly identify exhibits pursuant to Section V.E. of the CM/ECF Policies and Procedures Manual (i.e., "Exhibit A" is not a sufficient description). Additionally, when filing a document with more than five exhibits, the first attached exhibit must be an index of all of the subsequent attached documents. Counsel is directed to refile. (Collins, S.)
October 1, 2019 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY - Failure to File Financial Disclosure Statement as to Alessandro Masi. Pursuant to 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Civil Rule 7.3, all parties shall file a financial disclosure statement. A negative statement is required if a party has no disclosures to make. The disclosure statement must be on a form provided by the clerk. This form is available at the clerk's office and on the court's website. (Collins, S.)
October 1, 2019 Notice to Counsel regarding: #1 Complaint. Exhibits 4 and 5. Counsel is reminded pursuant to IV.B. of the court's CM/ECF Policies and Procedures Manual that the court requires 'flattened' versions of fillable documents and forms to be filed. When refiling this docket entry, counsel should flatten the documents. (Collins, S.)
October 1, 2019 Notice to Counsel - This case should have been filed in the Western division. The Clerk will enter a reassignment order correcting the error. (Rudd, D.)
October 1, 2019 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY regarding #1 Complaint - Payment of the civil filing fee is due upon case initiation. Payments can be made in the form of cash, checks, or credit cards and paid at the clerk's office during regular business hours. Credit card payments can be made over the telephone to the clerk's office during regular business hours. Also, Pay.gov is an additional credit card option that allows the filer to pay filing fee contemporaneously with the case opening in CM/ECF. (See Section V.D(1)(a) of the CM/ECF Policies and Procedures Manual. (Rudd, D.)
September 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Mythical Entertainment ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 31.), filed by Alessandro Masi. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Proposed Summons, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Copyright Form) (Liebowitz, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Masi v. Mythical Entertainment
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mythical Entertainment
Represented By: Christopher M. Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alessandro Masi
Represented By: Richard P. Liebowitz
Represented By: Albert P. Allan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?