Van Hoever v. Magnificent Baby, LLC
Plaintiff: Chrissie Van Hoever
Defendant: MAGNIFICENT BABY, LLC
Case Number: 5:2019cv00489
Filed: November 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Terrence W Boyle
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 501
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 10, 2019 Case Selected for Mediation - A printable list of certified mediators for the Eastern District of North Carolina is available on the court's Website, http://www.nced.uscourts.gov/attorney/mediators.aspx. Please serve this list on all parties. (Stouch, L.)
December 2, 2019 Filing 7 Waiver of Service Returned Executed filed by Chrissie Van Hoever. Magnificent Baby, LLC waiver sent on 11/4/2019, answer due 1/3/2020. (Parsons, Gavin)
November 4, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Magnificent Baby, LLC. (*NOTICE: Counsel shall print the attached summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4.*) (Rudd, D.)
November 4, 2019 Filing 5 COPYRIGHT REPORT: Copy of report and complaint forwarded to the Register of Copyrights located at the Copyright Office, Library of Congress, Washington, DC 20559 via US Mail on November 4, 2019. (Rudd, D.)
November 4, 2019 Notice to Counsel regarding: [1-1] Civil Cover Sheet, [1-2] Proposed Summons. Counsel is reminded that the court prefers flattened pdf fillable forms. Counsel should "flatten" the civil cover sheet and the proposed summons prior to attaching it in accordance with Section IV.B of the CM/ECF Policies and Procedures Manual. No further action is needed at this time. (Rudd, D.)
November 2, 2019 Filing 4 Notice of Appearance filed by David E. Bennett on behalf of Chrissie Van Hoever. (Bennett, David)
November 2, 2019 Filing 3 Notice of Appearance filed by Gavin B. Parsons on behalf of Chrissie Van Hoever. (Parsons, Gavin)
November 1, 2019 Filing 2 Financial Disclosure Statement by Chrissie Van Hoever (Parsons, Gavin)
November 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against MAGNIFICENT BABY, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0417-5168766.), filed by Chrissie Van Hoever. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons) (Parsons, Gavin) (Attachments 1 and 2 flattened and replaced on 12/2/2019) (Edwards, S.).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Van Hoever v. Magnificent Baby, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MAGNIFICENT BABY, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chrissie Van Hoever
Represented By: Gavin B. Parsons
Represented By: David E. Bennett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?