Aquestive Therapeutics, Inc. v. BioDelivery Sciences International, Inc.
Plaintiff: Aquestive Therapeutics, Inc.
Defendant: BioDelivery Sciences International, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2019cv00505
Filed: November 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Terrence W Boyle
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 18, 2019 Filing 19 RESPONSE in Opposition regarding #17 MOTION to Stay filed by Aquestive Therapeutics, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Fatpipe, Inc. v. Talari Networks, Inc. Order) (Evans, E.)
December 10, 2019 Case Selected for Mediation - A printable list of certified mediators for the Eastern District of North Carolina is available on the court's Website, http://www.nced.uscourts.gov/attorney/mediators.aspx. Please serve this list on all parties. (Stouch, L.)
November 27, 2019 Filing 18 Memorandum in Support regarding #17 MOTION to Stay filed by BioDelivery Sciences International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Borchers, Lynne)
November 27, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION to Stay filed by BioDelivery Sciences International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Borchers, Lynne)
November 27, 2019 Filing 16 Notice of Special Appearance for non-district by Thomas F. Foley on behalf of BioDelivery Sciences International, Inc.. (Foley, Thomas)
November 27, 2019 Filing 15 Notice of Special Appearance for non-district by Kia L. Freeman on behalf of BioDelivery Sciences International, Inc.. (Freeman, Kia)
November 27, 2019 Filing 14 Notice of Special Appearance for non-district by Wyley S. Proctor on behalf of BioDelivery Sciences International, Inc.. (Proctor, Wyley)
November 26, 2019 Filing 13 Notice of Appearance filed by Peter D. Siddoway on behalf of BioDelivery Sciences International, Inc.. (Siddoway, Peter)
November 26, 2019 Filing 12 Notice of Appearance filed by Lynne A. Borchers on behalf of BioDelivery Sciences International, Inc.. (Borchers, Lynne)
November 20, 2019 Filing 11 Notice of Special Appearance for non-district by John l. Abramic on behalf of Aquestive Therapeutics, Inc.. (Abramic, John)
November 15, 2019 Filing 10 Waiver of Service Returned Executed filed by Aquestive Therapeutics, Inc.. (Evans, E.)
November 14, 2019 Filing 9 Notice filed by Aquestive Therapeutics, Inc. of Amended Civil Cover Sheet. (Evans, E.)
November 12, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to BioDelivery Sciences International, Inc. (*NOTICE: Counsel shall print the attached summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4.*). (Rudd, D.)
November 12, 2019 Filing 7 PATENT REPORT: Copy of report and complaint forwarded to Mail Stop 8, Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office, P.O. Box 1450 Alexandria, VA 22313-1450 via US Mail on November 12, 2019. (Rudd, D.)
November 12, 2019 Filing 6 Notice of Special Appearance for non-district by James F. Hibey on behalf of Aquestive Therapeutics, Inc.. (Hibey, James)
November 11, 2019 Filing 5 Notice of Special Appearance for non-district by Jamie Lucia on behalf of Aquestive Therapeutics, Inc.. (Lucia, Jamie)
November 11, 2019 Filing 4 Notice of Appearance filed by Joseph A. Schouten on behalf of Aquestive Therapeutics, Inc.. (Schouten, Joseph)
November 11, 2019 Filing 3 Financial Disclosure Statement filed by Aquestive Therapeutics, Inc. (Evans, E.) Modified on 11/12/2019 to change docket entry text. (Stouch, L.).
November 11, 2019 Filing 2 Notice of Appearance filed by E. Bradley Evans on behalf of Aquestive Therapeutics, Inc.. (Evans, E.)
November 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against BioDelivery Sciences International, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0417-5178725.), filed by Aquestive Therapeutics, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - '167 Patent, #2 Exhibit B - Sirgo Affidavit, #3 Exhibit C - BDSI BEMA Webpage, #4 Exhibit D - Prescribing Information, #5 Exhibit E - '866 Patent, #6 Exhibit F - '843 Patent, #7 Exhibit G - '539 Patent, #8 Exhibit H - Chemistry Reviews, #9 Civil Cover Sheet, #10 Proposed Summons) (Evans, E.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Aquestive Therapeutics, Inc. v. BioDelivery Sciences International, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BioDelivery Sciences International, Inc.
Represented By: Wyley S. Proctor
Represented By: Lynne A. Borchers
Represented By: Kia L. Freeman
Represented By: Thomas F. Foley
Represented By: Peter D. Siddoway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aquestive Therapeutics, Inc.
Represented By: Joseph A. Schouten
Represented By: E. Bradley Evans
Represented By: Jamie Lucia
Represented By: James F. Hibey
Represented By: John L Abramic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?