Hamilton et al v. Moving Nation Deliveries LLC
Plaintiff: Mr. Carlton Hamilton and Ms. Kristina Hamilton
Defendant: Moving Nation Deliveries LLC
Case Number: 5:2019cv00527
Filed: November 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Terrence W Boyle
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 9, 2020 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Moving Nation Deliveries LLC. (*NOTICE: Counsel shall print the attached summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4.*) (Stouch, L.)
January 8, 2020 Filing 8 Notice filed by Carlton Hamilton, Kristina Hamilton Summons. (Richardson, Celie)
December 10, 2019 Case Selected for Mediation - A printable list of certified mediators for the Eastern District of North Carolina is available on the court's Website, http://www.nced.uscourts.gov/attorney/mediators.aspx. Please serve this list on all parties. (Stouch, L.)
December 2, 2019 Filing 7 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Moving Nation Deliveries LLC on 12/2/2019 by Carlton Hamilton, Kristina Hamilton. Waiver of Service due by 1/2/2020. (Richardson, Celie)
November 21, 2019 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Moving Nation Deliveries LLC on 11/21/2019 by Carlton Hamilton, Kristina Hamilton. Waiver of Service due by 12/21/2019. (Richardson, Celie)
November 21, 2019 Filing 5 Financial Disclosure Statement by Kristina Hamilton (Richardson, Celie)
November 21, 2019 Filing 4 Financial Disclosure Statement by Carlton Hamilton (Richardson, Celie)
November 21, 2019 Filing 3 Notice of Appearance filed by Celie Benton Richardson on behalf of Carlton Hamilton, Kristina Hamilton. (Richardson, Celie)
November 21, 2019 Filing 2 Notice filed by Carlton Hamilton, Kristina Hamilton Cover Sheet. (Richardson, Celie)
November 21, 2019 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY - Failure to File Financial Disclosure Statement as to Carlton Hamilton, Kristina Hamilton. Pursuant to 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Civil Rule 7.3, all parties shall file a financial disclosure statement. A negative statement is required if a party has no disclosures to make. The disclosure statement must be on a form provided by the clerk. This form is available at the clerk's office and on the court's website. (Rudd, D.)
November 21, 2019 Notice to Counsel - Counsel should file a Notice of Appearance pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.2(a). (Rudd, D.)
November 21, 2019 Notice to Counsel - No Summons provided for issuance or Waiver of Service filed. (Rudd, D.)
November 21, 2019 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY regarding #1 Complaint - Counsel failed to file a JS44 Civil Cover Sheet as required by the Court. Counsel should file a Cover Sheet using the event "Notice-Other" as soon as possible. (Rudd, D.)
November 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0417-5192548.), filed by Carlton Hamilton, Kristina Hamilton. (Richardson, Celie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hamilton et al v. Moving Nation Deliveries LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Moving Nation Deliveries LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mr. Carlton Hamilton
Represented By: Celie Benton Richardson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ms. Kristina Hamilton
Represented By: Celie Benton Richardson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?