United States of America v. Tall
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Defendant: MOUSSA TALL and BAMOUSSA TALL
Case Number: 5:2019cv00549
Filed: December 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Louise Wood Flanagan
Nature of Suit: Other Immigration Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1345
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 12, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. All Defendants. (Gray, Kathryne)
December 11, 2019 Filing 4 Notice of Appearance filed by Rudy E. Renfer on behalf of United States of America. (Renfer, Rudy)
December 4, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Moussa Tall. (*NOTICE: Counsel shall print the attached summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4.*) (Rudd, D.)
December 3, 2019 Filing 2 Notice of Appearance filed by Kathryne M. Gray on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Gray, Kathryne)
December 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT to Revoke Naturalization against MOUSSA TALL, filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Good Cause by Immigration Services Officer Tomas Rubalcava, #2 Proposed Summons Providing for a 60-Day Deadline to Respond to Complaint, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (Gray, Kathryne)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Tall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MOUSSA TALL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BAMOUSSA TALL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Kathryne M. Gray
Represented By: Rudy E. Renfer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?