The Travelers Indemnity Company v. Johnson Controls, Inc.
Plaintiff: The Travelers Indemnity Company
Defendant: Johnson Controls, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2019cv00580
Filed: December 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: James C Dever
Referring Judge: Louise Wood Flanagan
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 13, 2020 Filing 10 Notice of Special Appearance for non-district by Erin R. Soschin on behalf of Johnson Controls, Inc.. (Soschin, Erin)
February 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 INITIAL ORDER REGARDING PLANNING AND SCHEDULING - Discovery Plan due by 3/12/2020. Counsel should read attached order in its entirety for critical information and deadlines. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 2/6/2020. (Tripp, S.)
February 6, 2020 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Johnson Controls, Inc.. (Becker, Gloria)
February 6, 2020 Filing 7 Financial Disclosure Statement by Johnson Controls, Inc. (Becker, Gloria)
February 6, 2020 Filing 6 Notice of Appearance filed by Gloria Taft Becker on behalf of All Defendants. (Becker, Gloria)
February 6, 2020 Notice to Counsel (Erin Soschin) regarding #8 Answer to Complaint, #7 Financial Disclosure Statement - Pursuant to Section VI.C.2 of the CM/ECF Policies and Procedures Manual, each attorney making an appearance in the case must be a registered CM/ECF filer with this court and must file his or her own Notice of Appearance. (Tripp, S.)
January 21, 2020 Filing 5 Affidavit of Service for Summons, Complaint, Appearance of Counsel and Plaintiff's Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement filed by The Travelers Indemnity Company served on Johnson Controls, Inc. c/o CT Corporation System, Its Registered Agent on January 16, 2020. (Nalibotsky, Albert)
January 13, 2020 Case Selected for Mediation - A printable list of certified mediators for the Eastern District of North Carolina is available on the court's Website, http://www.nced.uscourts.gov/attorney/mediators.aspx. Please serve this list on all parties. (Collins, S.)
January 13, 2020 TEXT ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. At the direction of the Court, this Case is reassigned to U.S. District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan for all further proceedings. District Judge James C. Dever III is no longer assigned to case. All future filings shall reflect the revised case number of 5:19-CV-580-FL. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 1/13/2020. (Moore, P. ) Modified on 1/13/2020 to change text to purple. (Collins, S.).
January 6, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Johnson Controls, Inc. (*NOTICE: Counsel shall print the attached summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4.*). (Rudd, D.)
January 6, 2020 Notice to Counsel regarding: [1-1] Civil Cover Sheet, [1-2] Proposed Summons, #2 Notice of Appearance. Counsel is reminded that the court prefers flattened pdf fillable forms. Counsel should "flatten" the civil cover sheet, proposed summons and the notice of appearance prior to attaching it in accordance with Section IV.B of the CM/ECF Policies and Procedures Manual. No further action is needed at this time. (Rudd, D.)
December 27, 2019 Filing 3 Financial Disclosure Statement by The Travelers Indemnity Company identifying Corporate Parent The Travelers Companies, Inc., Corporate Parent Travelers Property Casualty Corp., Corporate Parent Travelers Insurance Group Holdings, Inc. for The Travelers Indemnity Company. (Nalibotsky, Albert)
December 27, 2019 Filing 2 Notice of Appearance filed by Albert S. Nalibotsky on behalf of The Travelers Indemnity Company. (Nalibotsky, Albert)
December 27, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Johnson Controls, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0417-5239943.), filed by The Travelers Indemnity Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons Proposed Summons to Johnson Controls, Inc.) (Nalibotsky, Albert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Travelers Indemnity Company v. Johnson Controls, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson Controls, Inc.
Represented By: Erin R. Soschin
Represented By: Gloria Taft Becker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Travelers Indemnity Company
Represented By: Albert S. Nalibotsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?