Mabry v. United States of America
Petitioner: Derrick Donnell Mabry
Respondent: United States of America
Case Number: 5:2019hc02232
Filed: August 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: James C Dever
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 16, 2019 Filing fee: $ 5.00, receipt number RAL074163. (Indig, A.)
September 10, 2019 Case Submitted to District Judge James C. Dever III for petition review. (Indig, A.)
September 3, 2019 Filing 4 CORRECTED PETITION (on the form) for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Derrick Donnell Mabry. (Attachment: #1 Envelope) (Indig, A.)
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER of Deficiency. The petition is not on the forms prescribed for use by this court AND the filing fee of $5.00 was not received or application to proceed without payment of fees and affidavit was not submitted. Responses due by 9/4/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert B. Jones, Jr. on 8/14/2019. Copy of order and forms sent via US Mail to petitioner at Butner FMC. (Indig, A.)
August 13, 2019 Filing 2 Letter regarding case opening sent via US Mail to Derrick Donnell Mabry at Butner - F.M.C. (Indig, A.)
August 13, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Derrick Donnell Mabry. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope) (Indig, A.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mabry v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Derrick Donnell Mabry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?