Hunt v. N.C. State
Petitioner: Willie H. Hunt
Respondent: N.C. State
Case Number: 5:2019hc02233
Filed: August 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: James C Dever
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 3, 2019 Case transferred to the Middle District of North Carolina. File transmitted electronically. (Indig, A.)
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER - The court ORDERS the clerk to TRANSFER this action to the United States District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina, where venue is proper. Signed by District Judge James C. Dever III on 9/3/2019. Copy sent via US Mail to petitioner at Franklin Correctional. (Indig, A.)
August 21, 2019 Case Submitted to District Judge James C. Dever III for petition review. (Indig, A.)
August 21, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Willie H. Hunt. (Attachment: #1 Envelope) (Indig, A.)
August 16, 2019 Filing 4 Document: "In Re Article VI Act III Sec 2, In Re 14th Amendments Personal Jurisdiction, In Re enumerations NC-US cont/Ex post facto Law" filed by Willie H. Hunt. (Attachments: #1 Document in Support, #2 Envelope) (Indig, A.)
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER of Deficiency. The filing fee of $5.00 was not received or application to proceed without payment of fees and affidavit was not submitted. Response due by 9/4/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert B. Jones, Jr. on 8/14/2019. Copy of order and form sent via US Mail to petitioner at Franklin Correctional. (Indig, A.)
August 13, 2019 Filing 2 Letter regarding case opening sent via US Mail to Willie H. Hunt at Franklin Correctional Center. (Indig, A.)
August 13, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus ("In Re Article 111 Sec 1,2 under 17-1 remedy of restraint under Common Law 4-1") filed by Willie H. Hunt. (Attachment: #1 Envelope) (Indig, A.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hunt v. N.C. State
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Willie H. Hunt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: N.C. State
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?