Berry v. Lloyd
Plaintiff: Duane Letroy Berry
Defendant: Kristina Lloyd
Case Number: 5:2020ct03188
Filed: May 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Terrence W Boyle
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions: Civil Detainee: Conditions of Confinement
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 15, 2020 Filing 7 CLERK'S JUDGMENT - IT IS ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that this action is hereby dismissed for failure to prosecute. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 7/15/2020. Copy of judgment and notice of appellate rights sent to plaintiff via U.S. Mail. (Poole, A)
July 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order Dismissing Case without prejudice for failure to prosecute. The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to close this case. Signed by Chief Judge Terrence W. Boyle on 7/14/2020. Copy of order sent to plaintiff via U.S. Mail. (Poole, A)
July 9, 2020 Case Submitted to Chief Judge Terrence W. Boyle regarding the order of deficiency. (Poole, A)
June 18, 2020 Filing 5 Notice of Criminal Complaint filed by Duane Letroy Berry. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Envelope) (Poole, A)
June 15, 2020 Filing 4 Letter from Duane Berry requesting subpoena forms. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Substitution, #2 Attachment, #3 Envelope) (Poole, A)
June 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER of Deficiency. You must either file an application to proceed without prepayment of fees and affidavit or pay $400.00. Responses due by 6/22/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert B. Jones, Jr., on 6/1/2020. Copy of order sent to plaintiff via U.S. Mail. (Poole, A)
May 28, 2020 Filing 2 Letter regarding case opening sent via U.S. Mail to Duane Letroy Berry at Butner - F.M.C. (Poole, A)
May 28, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (missing pages 4, 8-9) against Kristina Lloyd filed by Duane Letroy Berry. (Attachments: #1 Documents in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 USM 285 form, #4 Envelope) (Indig, A.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Berry v. Lloyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kristina Lloyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Duane Letroy Berry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?