Johnson v. Remache et al
Plaintiff: Robert Johnson
Defendant: NC Department of Public Safety, Jeffrey Hargrove, Sgt. Remache, Dr. Clifford A. Curtis and Barbra Watson Hargrove
Case Number: 5:2020ct03221
Filed: July 8, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Terrence W Boyle
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 27, 2020 Motion Submitted to Chief Judge Terrence W. Boyle regarding #7 MOTION to let the courts know defendant Remache threaten him in front of witnesses for filing lawsuit on her, etc. (Poole, A)
August 21, 2020 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT by Robert Johnson (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope) (Poole, A)
August 13, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION to let the courts know defendant Remache threaten him in front of witnesses for filing lawsuit on her, etc., filed by Robert Johnson. (Attachment: #1 Envelope) (Poole, A) Modified on 8/27/2020 to correct docket text(Poole, A).
August 12, 2020 Filing 6 Letter from Robert H. Johnson regarding legal mail not being sent. (Poole, A)
August 12, 2020 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT by Robert Johnson (Attachment: #1 Envelope) (Poole, A)
July 15, 2020 Filing 4 Document: Correction in Section II previous in forma pauperis lawsuits filed by Robert Johnson. (Attachment: #1 Envelope) (Poole, A)
July 8, 2020 Case Submitted to Chief Judge Terrence W. Boyle for complaint review. (Poole, A)
July 8, 2020 Filing 3 Letter regarding case opening sent via U.S. Mail to Robert Johnson at Warren Correctional Institution. (Poole, A)
July 8, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees filed by Robert Johnson. (Indig, A.)
July 8, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Clifford A. Curtis, Barbra Watson Hargrove, Jeffrey Hargrove, NC Department of Public Safety and Sgt. Remache filed by Robert Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope) (Indig, A.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Remache et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NC Department of Public Safety
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey Hargrove
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sgt. Remache
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Clifford A. Curtis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barbra Watson Hargrove
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?