Fraley v. Dillard et al
Plaintiff: Shawn Germaine Fraley
Defendant: Captain Hill Dillard and Sergeant Dance
Case Number: 5:2020ct03223
Filed: July 8, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: James C Dever
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 21, 2020 Motion Submitted to District Judge James C. Dever III regarding #3 MOTION to Appoint Counsel. Case also submitted for complaint review. (Indig, A.)
July 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER - GRANTING #2 Motion to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert B. Jones, Jr. on 7/21/2020. Copy sent to plaintiff via US Mail. (Indig, A.)
July 21, 2020 Motion Referred to US Magistrate Judge Robert B. Jones, Jr. regarding #2 MOTION to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees. (Indig, A.)
July 21, 2020 Filing 7 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement. (Indig, A.)
July 10, 2020 Filing 6 TRUST FUND INFORMATION REQUESTED. (Indig, A.)
July 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order (Prisoner Litigation Reform Act). Response to Order due by 7/31/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert B. Jones, Jr. on 7/9/2020. Copy sent to plaintiff via US Mail. (Indig, A.)
July 8, 2020 Filing 4 Letter regarding case opening sent via US Mail to Shawn Germaine Fraley at Pasquotank Correctional Institution. (Indig, A.)
July 8, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Shawn Germaine Fraley. (Indig, A.)
July 8, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees filed by Shawn Germaine Fraley. (Indig, A.)
July 8, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Sergeant Dance and Hill Dillard filed by Shawn Germaine Fraley. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Envelope) (Indig, A.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fraley v. Dillard et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shawn Germaine Fraley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Captain Hill Dillard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sergeant Dance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?