Lattimore v. Hooks et al
Plaintiff: Don Orlando Lattimore
Defendant: Lieutenant E. Nelson, Erik A. Hooks, Nurse S. DeBruhl, Claudette Edwards and Kenneth E. Lassiter
Case Number: 5:2020ct03225
Filed: July 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: James C Dever
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 27, 2020 Case Submitted to District Judge James C. Dever III for complaint review. (Indig, A.)
August 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER - GRANTING #4 Motion to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert B. Jones, Jr. on 8/27/2020. Copy sent to plaintiff via US Mail. (Indig, A.)
August 26, 2020 Motion Referred to US Magistrate Judge Robert B. Jones, Jr. regarding #4 MOTION to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees. (Indig, A.)
August 26, 2020 Filing 7 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement. (Indig, A.)
August 5, 2020 Filing 6 TRUST FUND INFORMATION REQUESTED. (Indig, A.)
August 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order (Prisoner Litigation Reform Act). Response to Order due by 8/26/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert B. Jones, Jr. on 8/5/2020. Copy sent to plaintiff via US Mail. (Indig, A.)
August 3, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees filed by Don Orlando Lattimore. (Attachment: #1 Envelope) (Indig, A.)
July 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER of Deficiency. You must either file an application to proceed without prepayment of fees and affidavit or pay $400.00. Response due by 7/31/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert B. Jones, Jr. on 7/10/2020. Copy of order and form sent to plaintiff via US Mail. (Indig, A.)
July 9, 2020 Filing 2 Letter regarding case opening sent via US Mail to Don Orlando Lattimore at Catawba Correctional Center. (Indig, A.)
July 9, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against S. DeBruhl, Claudette Edwards, Erik A. Hooks, Kenneth E. Lassiter and E. Nelson filed by Don Orlando Lattimore. (Attachment: #1 Documents in Support) (Indig, A.) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/14/2020: #2 Envelope) (Indig, A.).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lattimore v. Hooks et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lieutenant E. Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Erik A. Hooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nurse S. DeBruhl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Claudette Edwards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth E. Lassiter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Don Orlando Lattimore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?