Hammond v. Golden
Plaintiff: Veronica Nakia Hammond
Defendant: Sergeant Golden
Case Number: 5:2020ct03260
Filed: August 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Richard E Myers
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 8, 2020 Case Submitted to District Judge Richard E. Myers II for frivolity review. As soon as the screening is concluded, an order will issue and the next appropriate step will be taken. (Docket sheet mailed to plaintiff.) (Castania, M)
September 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #2 Motion to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert B. Jones, Jr. on 9/8/2020. Copy served via US Mail: Veronica Nakia Hammond 0787446, Anson Correctional Institution, P.O. Box 280, Polkton, NC 28135; and on NC Department of Public Safety. (Castania, M)
September 8, 2020 Motion Referred to US Magistrate Judge Robert B. Jones, Jr. regarding #2 MOTION to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees. (Castania, M)
September 4, 2020 Filing 6 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement. (Edwards, S.)
August 20, 2020 Filing 5 TRUST FUND INFORMATION REQUESTED. (Indig, A.)
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order (Prisoner Litigation Reform Act). Response to Order due by 9/10/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert B. Jones, Jr. on 8/20/2020. Copy sent to plaintiff via US Mail. (Indig, A.)
August 18, 2020 Filing 3 Letter regarding case opening sent via US Mail to Veronica Nakia Hammond at Anson Correctional Institution. (Indig, A.)
August 18, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees filed by Veronica Nakia Hammond. (Indig, A.)
August 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Sergeant Golden filed by Veronica Nakia Hammond. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope) (Indig, A.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hammond v. Golden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Veronica Nakia Hammond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sergeant Golden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?