Johnson v. Baker et al
Plaintiff: Richard L Johnson
Defendant: Ohio Casualty Insurance Company and Gerald Baker
Case Number: 5:2020cv00004
Filed: January 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: James C Dever
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 2000 e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 25, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 4, 2020 Filing 15 Memorandum in Support regarding #14 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Gerald Baker. (Davis, Melissa)
March 4, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Gerald Baker. (Davis, Melissa)
February 16, 2020 Filing 13 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Richard L Johnson as to Ohio Casualty Insurance Company. (Zeszotarski, Joseph)
February 3, 2020 Motion Referred to Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court regarding #12 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer regarding #2 Complaint. (Sellers, N.)
February 3, 2020 TEXT ORDER granting Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time #12 . For good cause shown, it is ordered that Defendants have up to and including March 4, 2020, within which to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint #2 . Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 2/3/2020. (Hockaday, A.)
January 31, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer regarding #2 Complaint, filed by Gerald Baker, Ohio Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion for Extension of Time) (Davis, Melissa)
January 31, 2020 Filing 11 Notice of Appearance filed by Janean Bryant Dunn on behalf of Gerald Baker, Ohio Casualty Insurance Company. (Dunn, Janean)
January 31, 2020 Filing 10 Notice of Appearance filed by Jason Vincent Federmack on behalf of Gerald Baker, Ohio Casualty Insurance Company. (Federmack, Jason)
January 31, 2020 Filing 9 Financial Disclosure Statement by Ohio Casualty Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Liberty Mutual Insurance Companies for Ohio Casualty Insurance Company. (Davis, Melissa)
January 31, 2020 Filing 8 Financial Disclosure Statement by Gerald Baker (Davis, Melissa)
January 31, 2020 Filing 7 Notice of Appearance filed by Melissa R. Davis on behalf of Gerald Baker, Ohio Casualty Insurance Company. (Davis, Melissa)
January 22, 2020 Case Selected for Mediation - A printable list of certified mediators for the Eastern District of North Carolina is available on the court's Website, http://www.nced.uscourts.gov/attorney/mediators.aspx. Please serve this list on all parties. (Sellers, N.)
January 9, 2020 Filing 6 Notice of Appearance filed by Joseph E. Zeszotarski, Jr on behalf of Richard L Johnson. (Zeszotarski, Joseph)
January 9, 2020 Filing 5 Financial Disclosure Statement by Richard L Johnson (Zeszotarski, Joseph)
January 9, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Gerald Baker, Ohio Casualty Insurance Company. (*NOTICE: Counsel shall print the attached summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4.*) (Rudd, D.)
January 9, 2020 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY - Failure to File Financial Disclosure Statement as to Richard L Johnson. Pursuant to 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Civil Rule 7.3, all parties shall file a financial disclosure statement. A negative statement is required if a party has no disclosures to make. The disclosure statement must be on a form provided by the clerk. This form is available at the clerk's office and on the court's website. (Rudd, D.)
January 9, 2020 Notice to Counsel - All Counsel should file a Notice of Appearance pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.2(a). (Rudd, D.)
January 9, 2020 Notice to Counsel - Counsel is reminded that the court prefers flattened pdf fillable forms. Counsel should "flatten" the proposed summons and the civil cover sheet prior to attaching it in accordance with Section IV.B of the CM/ECF Policies and Procedures Manual. No further action is needed at this time. (Rudd, D.)
January 7, 2020 Filing 3 Notice filed by Richard L Johnson Civil Cover Sheet. (Zeszotarski, Joseph) (Main Document 3 flattened and replaced on 1/18/2020) (Edwards, S.).
January 7, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0417-5251991.), filed by Richard L Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons Gerald Baker Proposed Summons, #2 Proposed Summons Ohio Casualty Insurance Proposed Summons) (Zeszotarski, Joseph) (Attachments 1 and 2 flattened and replaced on 1/18/2020) (Edwards, S.).
January 7, 2020 Filing 1 REFILED AT DE #2 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0417-5251991.), filed by Richard L Johnson. (Zeszotarski, Joseph) Modified on 1/9/2020 to reflect that complaint was refiled at DE #2 . (Rudd, D.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Baker et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ohio Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Jason Vincent Federmack
Represented By: Melissa R. Davis
Represented By: Janean Bryant Dunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gerald Baker
Represented By: Jason Vincent Federmack
Represented By: Melissa R. Davis
Represented By: Janean Bryant Dunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard L Johnson
Represented By: Joseph E. Zeszotarski, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?