Hutcheson v. Outback Steakhouse of Florida, LLC
Plaintiff: Katherine Hutcheson
Defendant: Outback Steakhouse of Florida, LLC, John Doe 2 and John Doe 1
Case Number: 5:2020cv00043
Filed: February 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Richard E Myers
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 5, 2020 Filing 20 Letter from Susan Edwards, Deputy, to Clerk of Court for the Nash County Courthouse for Nash County advising of the remand of this matter to their court along with a copy of this court's order dated 3/5/2020. CC:counsel via email. (Edwards, S.)
March 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER denying as moot #14 Motion to Remand and granting #16 Motion to Remand. This matter is hereby remanded to the Superior Court of Nash County, North Carolina. Signed by District Judge Richard E. Myers II on 3/5/2020. (Edwards, S.)
March 5, 2020 Filing 18 Proposed Order regarding #16 Consent MOTION to Remand filed by Outback Steakhouse of Florida, LLC. (Page, Christopher)
March 5, 2020 Submitted the #18 Proposed Order to District Judge Richard E. Myers II. (Edwards, S.)
March 4, 2020 Filing 17 Memorandum in Support regarding #16 Consent MOTION to Remand (Joint) filed by Outback Steakhouse of Florida, LLC. (Page, Christopher)
March 4, 2020 Filing 16 Consent MOTION to Remand filed by Outback Steakhouse of Florida, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Stipulation and Agreement Regarding Damages) (Page, Christopher)
March 4, 2020 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY regarding #16 Motion to Remand. At the direction of the court, counsel shall file a proposed order. The order must be filed electronically using the event PROPOSED ORDER located in the RESPONSES AND REPLIES category. Additionally, the judge's practice preferences MAY require counsel to email the proposed order in a word processing format. (Edwards, S.)
March 4, 2020 Motions Submitted to District Judge Richard E. Myers II regarding #14 Amended MOTION to Remand correcting to Nash County instead of Wilson County, #16 Consent MOTION to Remand . (Edwards, S.)
February 26, 2020 Filing 15 ANSWER to #10 Amended Complaint by Outback Steakhouse of Florida, LLC. (Page, Christopher)
February 19, 2020 Filing 14 Corrected MOTION to Remand correcting to Nash County instead of Wilson County filed by Katherine Hutcheson. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Smith, Eliot)
February 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER FOR DISCOVERY PLAN sent to all parties. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 2/14/2020. (Edwards, S.)
February 14, 2020 Case Selected for Mediation - A printable list of certified mediators for the Eastern District of North Carolina is available on the court's Website, http://www.nced.uscourts.gov/attorney/mediators.aspx. Please serve this list on all parties. (Edwards, S.)
February 12, 2020 Filing 12 Memorandum in Support regarding #11 MOTION to Remand filed by Katherine Hutcheson. (Smith, Eliot)
February 12, 2020 Filing 11 *CORRECTED AND REFILED AT #14 * - MOTION to Remand filed by Katherine Hutcheson. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Smith, Eliot)
February 12, 2020 Filing 10 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Outback Steakhouse of Florida, LLC, filed by Katherine Hutcheson. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons Civil Summons for Def Does) (Smith, Eliot)
February 12, 2020 Filing 9 Financial Disclosure Statement by Katherine Hutcheson (Smith, Eliot)
February 12, 2020 Filing 8 Notice of Appearance filed by Eliot F. Smith on behalf of Katherine Hutcheson. (Smith, Eliot)
February 12, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint by Outback Steakhouse of Florida, LLC. (Page, Christopher)
February 5, 2020 Filing 6 Notice regarding #1 Notice of Removal and requirement to make a Notice of Appearance sent to Plaintiff's Counsel William M.J. Farris of Farris & Thomas Law at P. O. Box 2828, Wilson, NC 27894-2828 mailed via US Mail on February 5, 2020. (Rudd, D.)
February 5, 2020 Filing 5 Notice of Appearance filed by Caitlin Mitchell on behalf of Outback Steakhouse of Florida, LLC. (Mitchell, Caitlin)
February 5, 2020 Filing 4 Financial Disclosure Statement by Outback Steakhouse of Florida, LLC identifying Corporate Parent OSI Restaurant Partners, LLC, Corporate Parent OSI HoldCo, Inc., Corporate Parent OSI HoldCo I, Inc., Corporate Parent OSI HoldCo II, Inc., Corporate Parent Bloomin' Brands, Inc. for Outback Steakhouse of Florida, LLC. (Page, Christopher)
February 5, 2020 Filing 3 Notice of Appearance filed by Christopher A. Page on behalf of Outback Steakhouse of Florida, LLC. (Page, Christopher)
February 5, 2020 Filing 2 Notice filed by Outback Steakhouse of Florida, LLC regarding #1 Notice of Removal, (Supplemental Removal Cover Sheet). (Page, Christopher)
February 5, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Outback Steakhouse of Florida, LLC from Nash, case number 19 CvS 1896. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0417-5300054), filed by Outback Steakhouse of Florida, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Civil Summons, #2 Exhibit B - Complaint, #3 Exhibit C - Acceptance of Service, #4 Civil Action Cover Sheet) (Page, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hutcheson v. Outback Steakhouse of Florida, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Outback Steakhouse of Florida, LLC
Represented By: Caitlin Mitchell
Represented By: Christopher A. Page
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe 2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe 1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Katherine Hutcheson
Represented By: Eliot F. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?