Tvrdy v. Tvrdy
Petitioner: Veronika Tvrdy
Respondent: Pavel Tvrdy
Case Number: 5:2020cv00048
Filed: February 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Louise Wood Flanagan
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 42:11601
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 17, 2020 Filing 16 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice by Veronika Tvrdy (Wood, Fred)
March 16, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER - This matter comes before the court on its consent order entered February 20, 2020. #15 . Within 14 days of this order, the parties are DIRECTED to either 1) file stipulation of dismissal pursuant to paragraph E. of the court's consent order, or 2) provide status report explaining what remains to be litigated in the instant action. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 3/16/2020. (Collins, S.)
February 20, 2020 In light of Consent Order #15 Preliminary Injunction Hearing set for 2/25/2020 at 1:30 PM in New Bern - Courtroom before District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan has been cancelled. (Collins, S.)
February 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #14 Consent MOTION Entry of Consent Order. Counsel is reminded to read the order in its entirety for critical deadlines and information. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 2/20/2020. (Collins, S.)
February 20, 2020 Filing 14 Consent MOTION Entry of Consent Order filed by Veronika Tvrdy. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Proposed Consent Order) (Wood, Fred)
February 14, 2020 Notice to Counsel regarding: #13 Notice of Appearance. The attorney information in the signature block does not match the information the court has in its CM/ECF database. Counsel is directed to update contact information in CM/ECF by choosing "Utilities" and selecting "Maintain Your Account." Contact the clerk's office if additional assistance is required. (Collins, S.)
February 14, 2020 Filing 13 Notice of Appearance filed by Stuart Hale Russell on behalf of Veronika Tvrdy. (Russell, Stuart)
February 12, 2020 Filing 12 Financial Disclosure Statement by Veronika Tvrdy (Wood, Fred)
February 12, 2020 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY - Failure to File Financial Disclosure Statement as to Veronika Tvrdy. Pursuant to 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Civil Rule 7.3, all parties shall file a financial disclosure statement. A negative statement is required if a party has no disclosures to make. The disclosure statement must be on a form provided by the clerk. This form is available at the clerk's office and on the court's website. (Collins, S.)
February 11, 2020 **** Set Hearing - Preliminary Injunction Hearing set for 2/25/2020 at 1:30 PM in New Bern - Courtroom before District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan. (Tripp, S.)
February 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #5 Ex Parte Motion for Temporary Restraining Order - The court schedules the preliminary injunction hearing for 1:30 p.m. on February 25, 2020 at the United States Courthouse in New Bern, North Carolina. Counsel should read attached order in its entirety for critical information and deadlines. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 2/11/2020. (Tripp, S.)
February 10, 2020 Motion Submitted to District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan regarding #5 EX PARTE MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Veronika Tvrdy. (Collins, S.)
February 10, 2020 Remark - Certified copy of Order #9 and file-stamped copies of summons, Petition for Return of Child Pursuant to Hague Convention, and notice of appearance forwarded to U.S. Marshal, along with USM-285 forms. (Collins, S.)
February 10, 2020 Filing 10 USM-285 Form - Process Receipt and Return (Collins, S.)
February 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Therefore, the Clerk having previously filed the petition and issued the summons [DE1, DE8], the United States Marshal is DIRECTED to serve the summons and a copy of the petition on respondent. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert B. Jones, Jr on 2/10/2020. (Collins, S.)
February 10, 2020 Motion Referred to US Magistrate Judge Robert B. Jones, Jr regarding #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (Collins, S.)
February 10, 2020 Motion No Longer Referred (Entered in Error): #5 EX PARTE MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Veronika Tvrdy. (Collins, S.)
February 10, 2020 Motion Referred to US Magistrate Judge Robert B. Jones, Jr regarding #5 EX PARTE MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Veronika Tvrdy. (Collins, S.)
February 10, 2020 Remark - Counsel should not serve the summons until the Motion for Leave to proceed in forma pauperis has been decided. (Rudd, D.)
February 10, 2020 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Pavel Tvrdy. (*NOTICE: Counsel shall print the attached summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4.*) (Rudd, D.) Modified on 2/10/2020 (Rudd, D.). *See Remark regarding summons.
February 7, 2020 Notice to Counsel: Counsel did not properly identify exhibits pursuant to Section V.E. of the CM/ECF Policies and Procedures Manual (i.e., "Exhibit 1" is not a sufficient description). The case administrator has corrected the entries. No action by counsel is required. (Edwards, S.)
February 7, 2020 Filing 7 Notice of filing - (Proposed Summons) - by Veronika Tvrdy regarding #1 Petition for Return of Child Pursuant to Hague Convention, . (Wood, Fred) Modified on 2/7/2020 to correct document description (Edwards, S.).
February 7, 2020 Filing 6 Memorandum in Support Ex Parte Motion for TRO filed by Veronika Tvrdy. (Wood, Fred)
February 7, 2020 Filing 5 EX PARTE MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Veronika Tvrdy . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Rule 65(b)(1)(B) Certification, #2 Exhibit 2 - Proposed Order and Rule to Show Cause) (Wood, Fred) Modified on 2/7/2020 to include document descriptions for the exhibits attached to this entry (Edwards, S.).
February 7, 2020 Filing 4 Notice of Appearance filed by Fred M. Wood, Jr on behalf of Veronika Tvrdy. (Wood, Fred)
February 7, 2020 Filing 3 Notice filed by Veronika Tvrdy Civil Cover Sheet. (Wood, Fred)
February 7, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis , filed by Veronika Tvrdy. (Wood, Fred)
February 7, 2020 Filing 1 Petition for Return of Child Pursuant to Hague Convention against Pavel Tvrdy, filed by Veronika Tvrdy. (Attachments: #1 Index, #2 Exhibit 1 - Request for Return, #3 Exhibit 2 - Birth Certificate, #4 Exhibit 3 - NC State Prison Inmte Details, #5 Exhibit 4 - Application Re:Custody Maintenance, #6 Exhibit 5 - Complaint, County of Harnett, #7 Exhibit 6 - Letter from US Department of State dated 8/20/2019, #8 Exhibit 7 - Letter from US Department of State dated 8/7/2019) (Wood, Fred) Modified on 2/7/2020 to include document descriptions for the exhibits attached to this entry (Edwards, S.).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tvrdy v. Tvrdy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Veronika Tvrdy
Represented By: Fred M. Wood, Jr.
Represented By: Stuart Hale Russell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Pavel Tvrdy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?