Zurich American Insurance Company v. Roadmark Corporation
Plaintiff: Zurich American Insurance Company
Defendant: Roadmark Corporation
Case Number: 5:2020cv00070
Filed: February 26, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Terrence W Boyle
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 13, 2020 Filing 8 Notice of Appearance filed by R. Scott Tobin on behalf of Zurich American Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope) (Stouch, L.)
March 18, 2020 Filing 7 Mail sent to R. Scott Tobin Returned as Undeliverable. (Stouch, L.)
March 2, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Roadmark Corporation. Copy sent via US Mail to R. Scott Tobin, Esq., 4208 Six Forks Road, Suite 1000, Raleigh, North Carolina 27609 for service. (Stouch, L.)
March 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Motion to File Manually. Mr. Tobin has leave to manually file documents in this case until April 16, 2020. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 3/2/2020. Copy sent via US Mail to R. Scott Tobin, Esq., 4208 Six Forks Road, Suite 1000, Raleigh, North Carolina 27609. (Stouch, L.)
February 27, 2020 Motion Referred to Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court regarding #4 MOTION to File Manually. (Stouch, L.)
February 26, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION to File Manually filed by Zurich American Insurance Company. (Rudd, D.)
February 26, 2020 Filing 3 Disclosure of Interested Parties filed by Zurich American Insurance Company. (Rudd, D.)
February 26, 2020 Filing 2 Financial Disclosure Statement filed by Zurich American Insurance Company. (Rudd, D.)
February 26, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Roadmark Corporation (Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number RAL077173), filed by Zurich American Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons) (Rudd, D.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zurich American Insurance Company v. Roadmark Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zurich American Insurance Company
Represented By: R. Scott Tobin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roadmark Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?