Valcorp Enterprises, LLC v. Diversity Resources Group, LLC et al
Plaintiff: VALCORP ENTERPRISES, LLC
Defendant: SAUER INCOPORATED, FEDERAL INSURANCE COMPANY and Sauer Incorporated
3Rd Party Plaintiff: DIVERSITY RESOURCES GROUP, LLC and NGM INSURANCE COMPANY
3Rd Party Defendant: Endurance American Insurance Company
Case Number: 5:2020cv00094
Filed: March 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Louise Wood Flanagan
Nature of Suit: Miller Act
Cause of Action: 40:270
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 6, 2020 Notice to Counsel. Counsel is reminded to include the judge's designation on the case number. The case number should read 5:20-cv-94-FL. (Collins, S.)
May 6, 2020 Filing 26 Summons on a Third-Party Complaint Issued as to Endurance American Insurance Company. *NOTICE: Counsel shall print the attached summonses and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4.* (Collins, S.)
May 6, 2020 Filing 25 Summons on A Third-Party Complaint Issued as to Endurance American Insurance Company. *NOTICE: Counsel shall print the attached summonses and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4.* (Collins, S.)
May 5, 2020 Filing 24 Notice of Special Appearance for non-district by Tania Sethi on behalf of Diversity Resources Group, LLC. (Sethi, Tania)
May 5, 2020 Filing 23 Notice of Special Appearance for non-district by Phillip W. Pemberton on behalf of Diversity Resources Group, LLC. (Pemberton, Phillip)
May 5, 2020 Filing 22 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, , THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Endurance American Insurance Company, CROSSCLAIM against Federal Insurance Company and against Sauer Incorporated, COUNTERCLAIM against Valcorp Enterprises, LLC by Diversity Resources Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons to Endurance American Insurance Company) (Bowers, Jessica) Modified on 5/6/2020 (Collins, S.).
May 5, 2020 Filing 21 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, , THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Endurance American Insurance Company, COUNTERCLAIM against Valcorp Enterprises, LLC by NGM Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons to Endurance American Insurance Company) (Ortiz, Michael)
May 5, 2020 Filing 20 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Federal Insurance Company, Sauer Incorporated. (Desmond, Robert)
April 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #16 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer regarding #1 Complaint. Federal Insurance Company and Sauer Incorporated answer due 5/5/2020. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 4/13/2020. (Collins, S.)
April 13, 2020 Motion Referred to Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court regarding #16 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer regarding #1 Complaint. (Collins, S.)
April 13, 2020 Filing 18 Financial Disclosure Statement by Federal Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Chubb Limited for Federal Insurance Company. (Desmond, Robert)
April 13, 2020 Filing 17 Financial Disclosure Statement by Sauer Incorporated identifying Corporate Parent Sauer Holdings, Inc. for Sauer Incorporated. (Desmond, Robert)
April 13, 2020 Filing 16 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer regarding #1 Complaint, filed by Federal Insurance Company, Sauer Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Desmond, Robert)
April 13, 2020 Filing 15 Notice of Appearance filed by Robert E. Desmond on behalf of Federal Insurance Company, Sauer Incorporated. (Desmond, Robert)
April 13, 2020 TEXT ORDER granting Defendant Diversity Resources Group, LLC's Motion for Extension of Time #13 . For good cause shown, and with the consent of Plaintiff, it is ordered that this defendant has up to and including May 5, 2020, within which to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint #1 . Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 4/13/2020. (Hockaday, A.)
April 13, 2020 Motion Referred to Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court regarding #13 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint. (Collins, S.)
April 13, 2020 Filing 14 Financial Disclosure Statement by Diversity Resources Group, LLC (Bowers, Jessica)
April 13, 2020 Filing 13 Corrected First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint filed by Diversity Resources Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Order for Enlargement of Time) (Bowers, Jessica) Modified on 4/13/2020 (Collins, S.).
April 13, 2020 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY regarding #11 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer. Pursuant to Local Civil Rule 6.1(a), this type of motion must show prior consultation with opposing counsel and the views of opposing counsel. Counsel is directed to refile. (Collins, S.)
April 13, 2020 Notice to Counsel regarding: #12 Notice of Appearance. The attorney information in the signature block does not match the information the court has in its CM/ECF database. Counsel is directed to update contact informationin CM/ECF by choosing "Utilities" and selecting "Maintain Your Account." Contact the clerk's office if additional assistance is required. (Collins, S.)
April 12, 2020 Filing 12 Notice of Appearance Local Rule 83.1 Counsel filed by Jessica E. Bowers on behalf of Diversity Resources Group, LLC. (Bowers, Jessica) Modified on 4/13/2020 to revise docket text. (Collins, S.).
April 12, 2020 Filing 11 **CORRECTED AND REFILED AT #13 ** First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint filed by NGM Insurance Company filed by Diversity Resources Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Order for Enlargement of Time) (Bowers, Jessica) Modified on 4/13/2020 (Collins, S.).
April 9, 2020 TEXT ORDER granting Defendant NGM Insurance Company's Motion for Extension of Time #10 . For good cause shown and with the consent of Plaintiff, it is ordered that this defendant has up to and including May 5, 2020, within which to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint #1 . Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 4/9/2020. (Hockaday, A.)
April 9, 2020 Motion Referred to Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court regarding #10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint. (Collins, S.)
April 9, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint filed by NGM Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Order for Enlargement of Time) (Ortiz, Michael)
April 6, 2020 Filing 9 Notice of Appearance filed by Heather E. Connor on behalf of NGM Insurance Company. (Connor, Heather)
April 6, 2020 Filing 8 Financial Disclosure Statement by NGM Insurance Company (Ortiz, Michael)
April 6, 2020 Filing 7 Notice of Appearance filed by Michael R. Ortiz on behalf of NGM Insurance Company. (Ortiz, Michael)
March 17, 2020 Filing 6 Financial Disclosure Statement by Valcorp Enterprises, LLC (Weston, Robert)
March 17, 2020 SECOND NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY - Failure to File Financial Disclosure Statement as to Valcorp Enterprises, LLC. Pursuant to 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Civil Rule 7.3, all parties shall file a financial disclosure statement. A negative statement is required if a party has no disclosures to make. The disclosure statement must be on a form provided by the clerk. This form is available at the clerk's office and on the court's website. (Collins, S.)
March 17, 2020 Case Selected for Mediation - A printable list of certified mediators for the Eastern District of North Carolina is available on the court's Website, http://www.nced.uscourts.gov/attorney/mediators.aspx. Please serve this list on all parties. (Collins, S.)
March 12, 2020 Filing 5 Notice filed by Valcorp Enterprises, LLC Civil Cover Sheet. (Weston, Robert)
March 12, 2020 Filing 4 Notice of Appearance filed by Robert A. Meynardie on behalf of Valcorp Enterprises, LLC. (Meynardie, Robert)
March 12, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Diversity Resources Group, LLC, Federal Insurance Company, NGM Insurance Company, Sauer Incorporated. (*NOTICE: Counsel shall print the attached summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4.*) (Rudd, D.)
March 12, 2020 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY - Failure to File Financial Disclosure Statement as to Valcorp Enterprises, LLC. Pursuant to 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Civil Rule 7.3, all parties shall file a financial disclosure statement. A negative statement is required if a party has no disclosures to make. The disclosure statement must be on a form provided by the clerk. This form is available at the clerk's office and on the court's website. (Rudd, D.)
March 12, 2020 Notice to Counsel - All Counsel should file a Notice of Appearance pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.2(a). (Rudd, D.)
March 12, 2020 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY regarding #1 Complaint - Counsel failed to file a JS44 Civil Cover Sheet as required by the Court. Counsel should file a Cover sheet using the event "Notice - Other" as soon as possible. (Rudd, D.)
March 11, 2020 Filing 2 Notice of Appearance filed by Robert William Weston on behalf of VALCORP ENTERPRISES, LLC. (Weston, Robert)
March 11, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0417-5351288.), filed by VALCORP ENTERPRISES, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons Proposed Summons to Sauer, #2 Proposed Summons Proposed Summons to NGM, #3 Proposed Summons Proposed Summons to DRG, #4 Proposed Summons Proposed Summons to Federal) (Weston, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Valcorp Enterprises, LLC v. Diversity Resources Group, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: DIVERSITY RESOURCES GROUP, LLC
Represented By: Jessica E. Bowers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: NGM INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: Heather E. Connor
Represented By: Michael R. Ortiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SAUER INCOPORATED
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FEDERAL INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: Robert E. Desmond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sauer Incorporated
Represented By: Robert E. Desmond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VALCORP ENTERPRISES, LLC
Represented By: Robert William Weston
Represented By: Robert A. Meynardie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Endurance American Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?