Liriano v. Wells Fargo Bank, National Association
Plaintiff: Carlos Liriano
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, National Association
Case Number: 5:2020cv00140
Filed: April 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Louise Wood Flanagan
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 6, 2020 Notice to Plaintiff regarding: #14 Notice of Self-Representation, #15 Financial Disclosure Statement. The case heading of these documents do not comply with Local Civil Rule 10.1. In future filings, plaintiff should include the caption of the case, the division and title of pleading in the caseheading as well as the case number. The case number should read 5:20-cv-140-FL. The Local Rules can be found on our website at www.nced.uscourts.gov. (A copy of this Notice was sent via US mail to Carlos Liriano, 2929 Landing Falls LaneRaleigh, NC 27616.) (Collins, S.)
May 6, 2020 Filing 15 Financial Disclosure Statement filed by Carlos Liriano. (Collins, S.)
May 6, 2020 Filing 14 Notice of Self-Representation filed by Carlos Liriano. (Attachments: #1 Inner envelope, #2 Outer envelope) (Collins, S.)
May 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 INITIAL ORDER REGARDING PLANNING AND SCHEDULING - Discovery Plan due by 6/10/20. Counsel should read attached order in its entirety for critical information and deadlines. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 5/6/2020. (A copy of this Order was sent via US mail to Carlos Liriano, 2929 Landing Falls Lane, Raleigh, NC 27616.) (Collins, S.)
May 4, 2020 Filing 12 Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Wells Fargo Bank, National Association. (Brown, Matthew)
April 30, 2020 Filing 11 Letter from Sandra Collins, Deputy Clerk, to Carlos Liriano regarding missing notice of self representation and disclosure statement forms. (Collins, S.)
April 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer regarding #1 Notice of Removal. Wells Fargo Bank, National Association answer due 5/4/2020. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 4/7/2020. (A copy of this Order was sent via US mail to Carlos Liriano, 2929 Landing Falls Lane, Raleigh, NC 27616.) (Collins, S.)
April 7, 2020 Motion Referred to Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court regarding #7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer. (Collins, S.)
April 7, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer as to #1 Notice of Removal filed by Wells Fargo Bank, National Association. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Brown, Matthew) Modified on 4/7/2020 to change filing event and revise docket text. (Collins, S.).
April 7, 2020 Filing 6 Notice filed by Wells Fargo Bank, National Association regarding #1 Notice of Removal, Notice of Filing. (Brown, Matthew)
April 6, 2020 Filing 5 Notice regarding #1 Notice of Removal and requirement to file a Notice of Appearance and a Notice of Self Representation mailed via US Mail to Carlos Liriano at 2929 Landing Falls Lane, Raleigh, NC 27616 on April 6, 2020. (Rudd, D.)
April 6, 2020 Filing 4 Notice of Appearance filed by Frederick T. Smith on behalf of Wells Fargo Bank, National Association. (Smith, Frederick)
April 6, 2020 Filing 3 Financial Disclosure Statement by Wells Fargo Bank, National Association identifying Corporate Parent WELLS FARGO & COMPANY for Wells Fargo Bank, National Association. (Brown, Matthew)
April 6, 2020 Filing 2 Notice of Appearance filed by Matthew Stanley Brown on behalf of Wells Fargo Bank, National Association. (Brown, Matthew)
April 6, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Wells Fargo Bank, National Association from Wake County Superior Court, case number 20cv003333. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0417-5381309), filed by Wells Fargo Bank, National Association. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplement Removal Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit A - Complaint and Affidavit of Service) (Brown, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Liriano v. Wells Fargo Bank, National Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, National Association
Represented By: Matthew Stanley Brown
Represented By: Frederick T. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlos Liriano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?