Morrison v. Cooper
Plaintiff: Billy Ray Morrison
Defendant: Roy Cooper
Case Number: 5:2020cv00145
Filed: April 8, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: James C Dever
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1651
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 28, 2020 Filing 4 MEMORANDUM AND RECOMMENDATIONS regarding #1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Billy Ray Morrison. Objections to Memorandum and Recommendations due by 6/11/2020. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Robert T. Numbers, II on 5/28/2020. Sent to Billy Ray Morrison at 438 Blake Road Jackson Spring, NC 27281 via US Mail. (Sellers, N.)
May 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER REFERRING MOTION: #1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Billy Ray Morrison. Motion referred to US Magistrate Judge Robert T. Numbers, II. Signed by District Judge James C. Dever III on 5/1/2020. Sent to Billy Ray Morrison at 438 Blake Road Jackson Spring, NC 27281 via US Mail. (Sellers, N.)
April 14, 2020 Motion Submitted to District Judge James C. Dever III regarding #2 MOTION for Electronic Notification. (Sellers, N.)
April 13, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Electronic Notification (Not on Pro Se Electronic Notification Registration Form) filed by Billy Ray Morrison. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Copy of File-Stamped Cover Sheet of Original Document filed, #3 Envelope) (Sellers, N.)
April 10, 2020 Motion Submitted to District Judge James C. Dever III regarding #1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (Sellers, N.)
April 10, 2020 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY regarding #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. A party who is proceeding without an attorney shall file a notice of self representation pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.2(b). (Rudd, D.)
April 10, 2020 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY - Failure to File Financial Disclosure Statement as to Billy Ray Morrison. Pursuant to 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Civil Rule 7.3, all parties shall file a financial disclosure statement. A negative statement is required if a party has no disclosures to make. The disclosure statement must be on a form provided by the clerk. This form is available at the clerk's office and on the court's website. (Rudd, D.)
April 8, 2020 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, filed by Billy Ray Morrison. (Attachments: #1 Attachment to IFP motion, #2 Proposed Complaint (Petition for Writ of Error Corma Nobis), #3 Attachment to Complaint, #4 Index of Exhibits, #5 Exhibit 1- Certified Copy of 00CRS949 (Child Abuse, Indecent Liberties with Child and First Degree Rape Child), #6 Exhibit Official Release Document, #7 Exhibit Copy of Envelope, #8 Exhibit Copy of Report from the Cumberland County Sheriff's Department, #9 Exhibit Copy of Trial Transcript from Cumberland County Superior Court Division, #10 Cover letter, #11 Envelope) (Rudd, D.) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/9/2020: #12 Exhibit 3- Judgment/Order 00CRS950, #13 Exhibit 4- Certified Copy of 99CRS14308 Voluntary Dismissal (Indicent Liberties with Child), #14 Exhibit 5- Certified Copy of Voluntary Dismissal of 99CRS14309 (Child Abuse - Sexual Act), #15 Exhibit 6- Certified Copy of Voluntary Dismissal of 99CRS14310 (First Degree Sex Offense Child), #16 Exhibit 8- Copy of Report from John F. Warren & Associates, PA, #17 Exhibit 9- Copy of Cumberland Co. Superior Court Division Transcript of Trial Volume I, #18 Exhibit 10- Copy of Cumberland Co. Superior Court Division Transcript of Trial Volume I - Parte II, #19 Exhibit 12- Copy of Motion for Expert Witness from Cumberland Co. Superior Court 00CRS949/950 & 99CRS 14308-14310, #20 Exhibit 13- Order for Expert Witness, #21 Exhibit 14- Order for Expert Witness Fee (non-testifying)) (Rudd, D.).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Morrison v. Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roy Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Billy Ray Morrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?