King et al v. United States of America et al
Plaintiff: Reginald Marlon King and Naa'El Saddiq Malik Bey
Defendant: Mike Pompeo, Donald J. Trump, William P. Barr, United States of America, United States Passport Agency Minnesota, Paul T. Benshoof and Steve T. Mnuchin
Case Number: 5:2020cv00146
Filed: May 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Office: Western Division Office
Presiding Judge: W Earl Britt
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 27, 2020 Filing 7 JUDGMENT - IT IS ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that the Court adopts the Memorandum and Recommendation as its own. The complaint is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 5/27/2020. (Herrmann, L.)
May 27, 2020 Filing 6 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Naa'El Saddiq Malik Bey, Reginald Marlon King. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit - Annexation, #2 Exhibit Affidavit - Oath of Amnesty, #3 Exhibit A copy from the United States of America - Department of the State, #4 Exhibit State of Missouri Certification, #5 Exhibit Copy of a Birth Certificate, #6 Exhibit Affidavit of Publication, #7 Exhibit Admendment of Assumed Business Certificate, #8 Exhibit The Zodiac Constitution, #9 Exhibit Case Law Information, #10 Exhibit Writ of Detinue, #11 Exhibit Letter to Passport Agency in Minneapolis dated 10/24/2019, #12 Exhibit UCC1 Filing in the State of Minnesota) (Herrmann, L.)
May 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; adopting #4 Memorandum and Recommendation. The complaint is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. The Clerk is DIRECTED to close the case. Signed by Senior Judge W. Earl Britt on 5/27/2020. Copy sent to Reginald Marlon King, 5131 Grandale Drive, Durham, NC 27713 via US Mail. (Herrmann, L.)
May 22, 2020 Motion Submitted to Senior Judge W. Earl Britt: #4 MEMORANDUM AND RECOMMENDATIONS regarding #1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Reginald Marlon King, Naa'El Saddiq Malik Bey. (Herrmann, L.)
May 4, 2020 Filing 4 MEMORANDUM AND RECOMMENDATION regarding #1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Reginald Marlon King, Naa'El Saddiq Malik Bey. It is RECOMMENDED that the application to proceed in forma pauperis be allowed and the complaint be dismissed. Objections to Memorandum and Recommendation due by 5/19/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert B. Jones, Jr. on 5/4/2020. Copy sent to Reginald Marlon King, 5131 Grandale Drive, Durham, NC 27713 via US Mail. (Herrmann, L.)
April 10, 2020 Motion Referred to US Magistrate Judge Robert B. Jones, Jr.: #1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (Herrmann, L.)
April 8, 2020 Filing 3 Financial Disclosure Statement filed by Reginald Marlon King. (Rudd, D.)
April 8, 2020 Filing 2 Notice of Self-Representation filed by Reginald Marlon King. (Rudd, D.)
April 8, 2020 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, filed by Naa'El Saddiq Malik Bey, Reginald Marlon King. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Complaint, #2 Exhibit Affidavit - Annexation, #3 Exhibit Affidavit - Oath of Amnesty, #4 Exhibit A copy from the United States of America - Department of the State, #5 Exhibit State of Missouri Certification, #6 Exhibit Copy of a Birth Certificate, #7 Exhibit Affidavit of Publication, #8 Exhibit Admendment of Assumed Business Certificate, #9 Exhibit The Zodiac Constitution, #10 Exhibit Case Law Information, #11 Exhibit Writ of Detinue, #12 Exhibit Letter to Passport Agency in Minneapolis dated 10/24/2019, #13 Exhibit UCC1 Filing in the State of Minnesota, #14 Civil Cover Sheet, #15 Proposed Summons) (Rudd, D.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: King et al v. United States of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Pompeo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald J. Trump
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William P. Barr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Passport Agency Minnesota
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul T. Benshoof
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve T. Mnuchin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Reginald Marlon King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Naa'El Saddiq Malik Bey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?