Coleman v. The Shaw University
Plaintiff: Christina Coleman
Defendant: The Shaw University
Case Number: 5:2020cv00155
Filed: April 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: James C Dever
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 26, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #10 Motion to Stay. All activity in this case, including the time for Defendant to respond to Plaintiffs Complaint, discovery, or any conferences be STAYED until Plaintiff notifies the Court that Plaintiffs currently pending charge of discrimination pending before the Equal Employment Opportunity Commission ("EEOC"), EEOC Charge No. 433-2020-00336 has been resolved. Plaintiff shall provide such notice to the Court within two (2) days of receiving notice from the EEOC. Plaintiff shall then have fourteen (14) days to file her amended pleading as a matter of course. Defendant shall have thirty (30) days to file a response to Plaintiffs Amended Complaint. Signed by District Judge James C. Dever III on 5/26/2020. (Sellers, N.)
May 20, 2020 Motion Submitted to District Judge James C. Dever III regarding #10 Consent MOTION to Stay. (Sellers, N.)
May 20, 2020 Filing 11 Proposed Order regarding #10 Consent MOTION to Stay filed by Christina Coleman. (Byrd, Quintin)
May 20, 2020 Notice to Counsel regarding: #10 Motion to Stay. Pursuant to Local Civil Rule 7.1(b)(3) and Section V(I)(3) of the CM/ECF Policy and Procedures Manual and Judge Dever's practice preferences, parties must file a proposed order with any non-dispositive motion. Please file a proposed order using the event 'Proposed Order' in the Responses and Replies category and link it back to the motion to which it corresponds. (Sellers, N.)
May 20, 2020 Filing 10 Consent MOTION to Stay filed by Christina Coleman. (Byrd, Quintin)
May 5, 2020 Case Selected for Mediation - A printable list of certified mediators for the Eastern District of North Carolina is available on the court's Website, http://www.nced.uscourts.gov/attorney/mediators.aspx. Please serve this list on all parties. (Sellers, N.)
April 22, 2020 Filing 9 Financial Disclosure Statement by Christina Coleman (Byrd, Quintin)
April 22, 2020 Filing 8 Notice of Appearance filed by Quintin D. Byrd on behalf of Christina Coleman. (Byrd, Quintin)
April 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The Shaw University answer due 5/22/2020. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 4/22/2020. Sent to Quintin D. Byrd at Q Byrd Law 9121 Anson Way, Suite 200 Raleigh, North Carolina 27615 via US Mail. (Sellers, N.)
April 22, 2020 Motion Referred to Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court regarding #6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint. (Sellers, N.)
April 21, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint filed by The Shaw University. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Blue, Dhamian)
April 15, 2020 Filing 5 Notice of Appearance filed by Dhamian A. Blue on behalf of The Shaw University. (Blue, Dhamian)
April 15, 2020 Filing 4 Notice regarding #1 Notice of Removal and requirement to make a Notice of Appearance sent to Plaintiff's Counsel Quintin D. Byrd of Q Byrd Law at 9121 Anson Way, Suite 200, Raleigh, North Carolina 27615 mailed via US Mail on April 15, 2020. (Rudd, D.)
April 15, 2020 Notice to Counsel - All Counsel should file a Notice of Appearance pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.2(a). (Rudd, D.)
April 15, 2020 Filing 3 Notice of Appearance filed by Daniel T. Blue, III on behalf of The Shaw University. (Blue, Daniel)
April 15, 2020 Filing 2 Financial Disclosure Statement by The Shaw University (Blue, Daniel)
April 15, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by The Shaw University from North Carolina Superior Court, Wake County, case number 20-CVS-500097. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0417-5392029), filed by The Shaw University. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Process and Pleadings, #2 Exhibit B - Notice to Clerk of Filing of Notice of Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (Blue, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Coleman v. The Shaw University
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christina Coleman
Represented By: Quintin D. Byrd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Shaw University
Represented By: Daniel T. Blue, III
Represented By: Dhamian A. Blue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?