Land v. Poth et al
Plaintiff: Billy Russell Land
Defendant: Brian Jones, Rebecca Elgart, Racheal Poth and Blair Williams
Case Number: 5:2020cv00158
Filed: April 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: James C Dever
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 7, 2020 Filing 28 SUMMONS Returned Executed - Brian Jones served on 7/6/2020, answer due 7/27/2020. (Stouch, L.)
July 28, 2020 Filing 27 Notice of Appearance filed by Ashley Honeycutt Terrazas on behalf of Racheal Poth. (Terrazas, Ashley)
July 28, 2020 Filing 26 Rule 12 Letter Issued as to #24 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM. Response due by 8/21/2020. Sent to Billy Russell Land at 1604 Curthay CourtRaleigh, NC 27610 via US Mail. (Sellers, N.)
July 28, 2020 Filing 25 Memorandum in Support regarding #24 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Blair Williams. (Shields, Kathryn)
July 28, 2020 Filing 24 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Blair Williams. (Shields, Kathryn)
July 28, 2020 Filing 23 Notice of Appearance filed by Kathryn H. Shields on behalf of Blair Williams. (Shields, Kathryn)
July 28, 2020 NOTICE OF CORRECTION regarding: #19 Motion to Dismiss. The document attached is not a motion. When filing a Memorandum in Support, please use the 'Memorandum in Support' event found in the Responses and Replies category. No action necessary at this time, case manager has corrected the docket entry. (Sellers, N.)
July 28, 2020 Filing 22 Rule 12 Letter Issued as to #18 MOTION to Dismiss. Response due by 8/20/2020. Sent to Billy Russell Land at 1604 Curthay CourtRaleigh, NC 27610 via US Mail. (Sellers, N.)
July 27, 2020 Filing 21 Financial Disclosure Statement by Racheal Poth (Leerberg, Matthew)
July 27, 2020 Filing 20 Notice of Appearance filed by Matthew Nis Leerberg on behalf of Racheal Poth. (Leerberg, Matthew)
July 27, 2020 Filing 19 Memorandum in Support regarding #18 MOTION TO DISMISS filed by Racheal Poth. (Leerberg, Matthew) Modified on 7/28/2020 - changed docket text to correctly identify document attached, added docket entry relationship. (Sellers, N.)
July 27, 2020 Filing 18 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Racheal Poth. (Leerberg, Matthew)
July 22, 2020 Filing 17 Financial Disclosure Statement by Rebecca Elgart (Anderson, Zebulon)
July 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #15 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Rebecca Elgart answer due 8/24/2020. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 7/21/2020. Sent to Billy Russell Land at 1604 Curthay Court Raleigh, NC 27610 via US Mail. (Sellers, N.)
July 21, 2020 Motion Referred to Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court regarding #15 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer. (Sellers, N.)
July 21, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Rebecca Elgart. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Anderson, Zebulon)
July 21, 2020 Filing 14 DISREGARD. Corrected and re-filed at #17 . Financial Disclosure Statement by Rebecca Elgart (Anderson, Zebulon) Modified on 7/22/2020 (Sellers, N.).
July 21, 2020 Filing 13 Notice of Appearance filed by Zebulon D. Anderson on behalf of Rebecca Elgart. (Anderson, Zebulon)
July 15, 2020 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed - Racheal Poth served on 7/6/2020, answer due 7/27/2020. (Sellers, N.)
July 15, 2020 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed - Rebecca Elgart served on 7/3/2020, answer due 7/24/2020. (Sellers, N.)
July 15, 2020 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed - Blair Williams served on 7/7/2020, answer due 7/28/2020. (Sellers, N.)
June 16, 2020 Remark: Certified copy of #4 Order and file-stamped copies of summonses and complaint forwarded to the United States Marshal for service, along with USM-285 Forms. (Sellers, N.)
June 16, 2020 Filing 8 Summonses Issued as to Rebecca Elgart, Brian Jones, Racheal Poth, Blair Williams. (Sellers, N.)
June 16, 2020 Filing 7 Document: Proposed Summonses filed by Billy Russell Land. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (Sellers, N.)
June 9, 2020 Filing 5 COMPLAINT against Rebecca Elgart, Brian Jones, Racheal Poth, Blair Williams, filed by Billy Russell Land. (Sellers, N.)
June 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by District Judge James C. Dever III on 6/9/2020. Sent to Billy Russell Land at 1604 Curthay Court Raleigh, NC 27610 via US Mail. (Sellers, N.)
May 30, 2020 Motion Submitted to District Judge James C. Dever III regarding #3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (Sellers, N.)
May 29, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Billy Russell Land. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (Sellers, N.)
May 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER denying without prejudice #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by District Judge James C. Dever III on 5/4/2020. Sent to Billy Russell Land at 1604 Curthay Court Raleigh, NC 27610 via US Mail. (Sellers, N.)
April 16, 2020 Motion Submitted to District Judge James C. Dever III regarding #1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (Sellers, N.)
April 16, 2020 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY regarding #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. A party who is proceeding without an attorney shall file a notice of self representation pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.2(b). (Rudd, D.)
April 16, 2020 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY - Failure to File Financial Disclosure Statement as to Billy Russell Land. Pursuant to 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Civil Rule 7.3, all parties shall file a financial disclosure statement. A negative statement is required if a party has no disclosures to make. The disclosure statement must be on a form provided by the clerk. This form is available at the clerk's office and on the court's website. (Rudd, D.)
April 15, 2020 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, filed by Billy Russell Land. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Envelope) (Rudd, D.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Land v. Poth et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rebecca Elgart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Racheal Poth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blair Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Billy Russell Land
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?