Stewart v. Trulite Glass & Aluminum Solutions, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Kimberly Stewart
Defendant: Mark Wood and Trulite Glass & Aluminum Solutions, LLC
Case Number: 5:2020cv00159
Filed: April 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Richard E Myers
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:451
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 12, 2020 Filing 15 Memorandum in Opposition filed by Kimberly Stewart. (Atwater, Brandon)
May 26, 2020 Filing 14 Notice of Appearance filed by Brandon S. Atwater on behalf of Kimberly Stewart. (Atwater, Brandon)
May 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER FOR DISCOVERY PLAN sent to all parties. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 5/26/2020. Copy sent to Brandon S. Atwater, Atwater Law PLLC, 400 West Main Street, Suite 612, Durham, NC 27701 via US Mail. (Edwards, S.)
May 22, 2020 Filing 12 Defendants Trulite Glass and Aluminum and Mark Wood ANSWER to Complaint by Trulite Glass & Aluminum Solutions, LLC, Mark Wood. (Day, Jourdan)
May 22, 2020 Filing 11 Memorandum in Support regarding #10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Defendants' Partial Motion to Dismiss filed by Trulite Glass & Aluminum Solutions, LLC, Mark Wood. (Day, Jourdan)
May 22, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Defendants' Partial Motion to Dismiss filed by Trulite Glass & Aluminum Solutions, LLC, Mark Wood. (Day, Jourdan)
May 15, 2020 Filing 9 Notice of Special Appearance for non-district by Michael J. Underwood on behalf of All Defendants. (Underwood, Michael)
May 15, 2020 Filing 8 Notice of Special Appearance for non-district by Jourdan D. Day on behalf of All Defendants. (Day, Jourdan)
May 11, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER - Pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(b)(2), [w]ithin 14 days after removal, counsel for all parties in the state-court action shall file either a notice of appearance, a notice of substitution of counsel, or a motion to withdraw in accordance with Local Civil Rule 5.2. The instant action was removed from Wake County Superior Court on April 16, 2020 [DE-1], and Plaintiff's counsel has not filed a notice of appearance, a notice of substitution of counsel, or a motion to withdraw in the requisite time period. Accordingly, Plaintiff is ORDERED to comport with Local Civil Rule 5.3(b)(2) within 14 days of the date of entry of this order. Signed by District Judge Richard E. Myers II on 5/11/2020. Copy sent to Brandon S. Atwater, Atwater Law PLLC, 400 West Main Street, Suite 612, Durham, NC 27701 via US Mail. (Edwards, S.)
April 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Trulite Glass & Aluminum Solutions, LLC answer due 5/23/2020; Mark Wood answer due 5/23/2020. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 4/20/2020. Copy sent to Brandon S. Atwater, Atwater Law PLLC, 400 West Main Street, Suite 612, Durham, NC 27701 via US Mail. (Edwards, S.)
April 20, 2020 Motion Referred to Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court regarding #6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO MOVE OR PLEAD. (Edwards, S.)
April 20, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO MOVE OR PLEAD filed by Trulite Glass & Aluminum Solutions, LLC. and Mark Woods (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Shouvlin, David) Modified on 4/20/2020 to include other filing defendant to this motion (Edwards, S.).
April 17, 2020 Filing 5 Financial Disclosure Statement by Mark Wood (Shouvlin, David)
April 17, 2020 Filing 4 Notice regarding #1 Notice of Removal and requirement to make a Notice of Appearance sent to Plaintiff's Counsel Brandon S. Atwater of Atwater Law PLLC at 400 West Main Street, Suite 612, Durham, NC 27701 mailed via US Mail on April 17, 2020. (Rudd, D.)
April 17, 2020 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY - Failure to File Financial Disclosure Statement as to Mark Wood. Pursuant to 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Civil Rule 7.3, all parties shall file a financial disclosure statement. A negative statement is required if a party has no disclosures to make. The disclosure statement must be on a form provided by the clerk. This form is available at the clerk's office and on the court's website. (Rudd, D.)
April 16, 2020 Filing 3 Notice of Appearance filed by David P. Shouvlin on behalf of All Defendants. (Shouvlin, David)
April 16, 2020 Filing 2 Financial Disclosure Statement by Trulite Glass & Aluminum Solutions, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Trulite Intermediate Holding, LLC, Corporate Parent Arch Aluminum & Glass Holding, LLC, Corporate Parent Arch Aluminum Holding Corp for Trulite Glass & Aluminum Solutions, LLC. (Shouvlin, David)
April 16, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by All Defendants from Wake County Superior Court, case number 20-CV-003943. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0417-5393783), filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit State Court Summons - Trulite, #3 Exhibit State Court Summons - Wood, #4 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Supplement Supp. Civil Cover Sheet) (Shouvlin, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stewart v. Trulite Glass & Aluminum Solutions, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Wood
Represented By: David P. Shouvlin
Represented By: Michael J. Underwood
Represented By: Jourdan D. Day
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trulite Glass & Aluminum Solutions, LLC
Represented By: David P. Shouvlin
Represented By: Michael J. Underwood
Represented By: Jourdan D. Day
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberly Stewart
Represented By: Brandon S. Atwater
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?