Issette v. Saul
Plaintiff: Ronnie Issette
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Case Number: 5:2020cv00200
Filed: May 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: James C Dever
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 206
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 10, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 23, 2020 Filing 9 USM-285 Form - Affidavit of Service for Summons and Complaint served on William Barr, US Attorney General on 6/15/2020. (Sellers, N.)
June 18, 2020 Filing 8 USM-285 Form - Summons Returned Executed by Personal Service as to Andrew Saul served on 6/5/2020, answer due 8/4/2020. (Sellers, N.)
June 18, 2020 Filing 7 USM-285 Form - Affidavit of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Andrew Saul, Commissioner of Social Security on 6/18/2020. (Sellers, N.)
May 20, 2020 Filing 6 Summonses Issued as to Andrew Saul, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Sellers, N.)
May 20, 2020 Filing 5 COMPLAINT against Andrew Saul, filed by Ronnie Issette. (Sellers, N.)
May 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by District Judge James C. Dever III on 5/20/2020. (Sellers, N.)
May 20, 2020 Remark: Certified copy of #4 Order and file-stamped copies of summonses and complaint forwarded to the United States Marshal for service, along with USM-285 Forms. (Sellers, N.)
May 14, 2020 Filing 3 Financial Disclosure Statement by Ronnie Issette (Arrowood, Derrick)
May 14, 2020 Filing 2 Notice of Appearance filed by Derrick Kyle Arrowood on behalf of Ronnie Issette. (Arrowood, Derrick)
May 14, 2020 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis , filed by Ronnie Issette. (Attachments: #1 US Marshal Form, #2 Complaint, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (Arrowood, Derrick)
May 14, 2020 Motion Submitted to District Judge James C. Dever III regarding #1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (Sellers, N.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Issette v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronnie Issette
Represented By: Derrick Kyle Arrowood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?