MacGregor v. Sink, Trustee
Interested Party: Stephanie J. Butler
Appellant: Bannor Michael MacGregor
Appellee: Kevin L. Sink, Trustee
Case Number: 5:2020cv00210
Filed: May 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Terrence W Boyle
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 30, 2020 Filing 10 JUDGMENT - IT IS ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that appellant's motion for leave to appeal is DENIED and request to stay pending appeal is DENIED AS MOOT. This case is closed. Signed by deputy clerk for Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 6/30/2020. (Stouch, L.)
June 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER denying #5 Motion for Leave to Appeal - Appellant's motion for leave to appeal is DENIED and request to stay pending appeal is DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by Chief Judge Terrence W. Boyle on 6/29/2020. (Stouch, L.)
June 3, 2020 Motion Submitted to Chief Judge Terrence W. Boyle regarding #5 MOTION for Leave to Appeal. (Stouch, L.)
May 27, 2020 Filing 8 Financial Disclosure Statement by Bannor Michael MacGregor (Kroll, William)
May 27, 2020 Filing 7 Notice of Appearance filed by William Howard Kroll on behalf of Bannor Michael MacGregor. (Kroll, William)
May 26, 2020 Filing 6 RESPONSE in Opposition regarding #5 MOTION for Leave to Appeal and for Expedited Ruling filed by Kevin L. Sink, Trustee. (Sink, Kevin)
May 22, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Stay and Leave to Appeal filed by Bannor Michael MacGregor. (Stouch, L.)
May 22, 2020 Filing 4 Financial Disclosure Statement by Kevin L. Sink, Trustee (Sink, Kevin)
May 22, 2020 Filing 3 Notice of Appearance filed by Kevin L. Sink on behalf of Kevin L. Sink, Trustee. (Sink, Kevin)
May 22, 2020 Notice to Counsel - All Counsel should file a Notice of Appearance pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.2(a). (Rudd, D.)
May 22, 2020 Filing 2 Notice of Docketing and Briefing Deadline regarding #1 Bankruptcy Appeal. (Rudd, D.)
May 21, 2020 Filing 1 Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. Bankruptcy Court case number 19-03113. (Attachments: #1 Judge David M. Warren's Order dated May 15, 2020) (Donleycott, S.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MacGregor v. Sink, Trustee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Stephanie J. Butler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Bannor Michael MacGregor
Represented By: William Howard Kroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Kevin L. Sink, Trustee
Represented By: Kevin L. Sink
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?