Abdel-Malak v. Cape Fear Valley Medical Center et al
Plaintiff: Abanoob Abdel-Malak
Defendant: John Doe #5, John Doe #4, John Doe #1, Cape Fear Valley Medical Center, John Doe #7, John Doe #6, John Doe #3, Joseph Shortall and John Doe #2
Case Number: 5:2020cv00221
Filed: July 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: W Earl Britt
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 10, 2020 Motions Submitted to Senior Judge W. Earl Britt: #9 Memorandum and Recommendations, #11 MOTION to Amend/Correct #10 Complaint. (Herrmann, L.)
August 4, 2020 Filing 14 Letter to Abanoob Abdel-Malak regarding #13 Notice of Appeal. (Original documents returned to plaintiff via US Mail) (Herrmann, L.)
July 31, 2020 Filing 13 Notice of Appeal filed by Abanoob Abdel-Malak as to #9 Order and Memorandum and Recommendation. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (Herrmann, L.)
July 31, 2020 Filing 12 Document: Demand for Jury Trial filed by Abanoob Abdel-Malak. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (Herrmann, L.)
July 31, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION to Amend/Correct #10 Complaint filed by Abanoob Abdel-Malak. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (Herrmann, L.)
July 24, 2020 Filing 10 COMPLAINT against Cape Fear Valley Medical Center, John Doe #1, John Doe #2, John Doe #3, John Doe #4, John Doe #5, John Doe #6, John Doe #7, Joseph Shortall filed by Abanoob Abdel-Malak. (Herrmann, L.)
July 24, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #5 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; denying #6 Motion for Permission for Electronic Filing; denying #8 Motion for Transfer and Consolidation an Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert T. Numbers, II on 7/24/2020. (See docket entry #9 ) (Herrmann, L.)
July 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER AND MEMORANDUM AND RECOMMENDATION regarding #5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Abanoob Abdel-Malak, #6 MOTION for Permission for Electronic Filing filed by Abanoob Abdel-Malak, #8 MOTION to Transfer, Consolidate, and/or Grant Extraordinary Relief for the Interest of Justice, MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Abanoob Abdel-Malak. It is recommended that the district court deny plaintiff's motion for a temporary restraining order and dismiss his complaint. Objections to Memorandum and Recommendation due by 8/7/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert T. Numbers, II on 7/24/2020. (Herrmann, L.)
June 15, 2020 Motion Referred to US Magistrate Judge Robert T. Numbers, II: #8 MOTION to Transfer, Consolidate, and/or Grant Extraordinary Relief for the Interest of Justice, MOTION to Appoint Counsel. (Herrmann, L.)
June 15, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION to Transfer, Consolidate, and/or Grant Extraordinary Relief for the Interest of Justice, MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Abanoob Abdel-Malak. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (Herrmann, L.)
June 9, 2020 Motions Referred to US Magistrate Judge Robert T. Numbers, II: #5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, #6 MOTION for Permission for Electronic Filing. (Herrmann, L.)
June 8, 2020 Filing 7 Proposed Summonses filed by Abanoob Abdel-Malak. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (Herrmann, L.)
June 8, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Permission for Electronic Filing filed by Abanoob Abdel-Malak. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (Herrmann, L.)
June 8, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Abanoob Abdel-Malak. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits in Support of Motion, #2 Envelope) (Herrmann, L.)
June 3, 2020 Notice of Pro Se E-Noticing - Pro se party has consented to receiving electronic service of all motions, notices, orders, and documents in civil cases in the Eastern District of North Carolina. All documents filed in CM-ECF will be served on this party via email pursuant to Rule 5 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Civil Rule 5.1. (Herrmann, L.)
June 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 DEFICIENCY ORDER regarding #1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Abanoob Abdel-Malak. The Clerk is DIRECTED to provide all the necessary forms regarding the deficiencies to Plaintiff for completion. Plaintiff is DIRECTED to correct the deficiencies and return the corrected documents within fourteen (14) days from the filing of this order. Failure to do so may result in the dismissal of this action without prejudice for failure to prosecute. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert T. Numbers, II on 6/2/2020. Copy and forms sent to Abanoob Abdel-Malak, 12159 Harvest Avenue, Norwalk, CA 90650 via US Mail. (Herrmann, L.)
May 27, 2020 Filing 3 Financial Disclosure Statement filed by Abanoob Abdel-Malak. (Rudd, D.)
May 27, 2020 Filing 2 Notice of Self-Representation filed by Abanoob Abdel-Malak. (Rudd, D.)
May 27, 2020 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (incorrect forms), filed by Abanoob Abdel-Malak. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Complaint, #2 Cover Page, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Notice of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of Summons (unsigned), #5 Proposed Summons, #6 Envelope) (Rudd, D.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Abdel-Malak v. Cape Fear Valley Medical Center et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe #5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe #4
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe #1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cape Fear Valley Medical Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe #7
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe #6
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe #3
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Shortall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe #2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Abanoob Abdel-Malak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?